Rolanda Ann Rhone
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-02042 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[37] Order Granting). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 16-02042-TOM Rolanda Ann Rhone Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: pbgray Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 2 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Rolanda Ann Rhone, 483 Theta Avenue South, Birmingham, AL 35205-3310 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9012821 +E-mail/Text: jenniferl@motorsacceptance.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:58 MOTORS ACCEPTANCE, PO BOX 468, COLUMBUS GA 31902-0468 TOTAL: 1 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;2941120420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 2 Case 16-02042-TOM13 Doc 38 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 720 81,7(' 67$7(6 %$1.5837&< &2857 1257+(51 ',675,&7 2) $/$%$0$ 6287+(51 ',9,6,21,Q WKH 0DWWHU RI 5RODQGD $QQ 5KRQH ` &DVH 1R 720 661;;;;; ` '(%725 6 ` ` ` 25'(5 *5$17,1* 7KLV PDWWHU FDPH EHIRUH WKH &RXUW RQ 7KXUVGD\ -DQXDU\ ents of counsel and the pleadings, the Motion is Granted and the Debtor is authorized to surrender the property. 'DWHG aged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/19/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rolanda Ann Rhone (Shinn, J.)
3
05/19/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
4
05/19/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
05/19/2016
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(16-02042-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19400244. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
05/19/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
6
05/19/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
7
05/19/2016
Motion to Determine Value of 2008 Chrysler 300 financed by Motors Acceptance Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone (Shinn, J.)
8
05/19/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/22/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/14/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 09/20/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/15/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/22/2016.
9
05/20/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
05/20/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone Case Number 93-07171, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/25/1993, Dismissed for Other Reason on 09/06/1996; Case Number 02-72366, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/09/2002, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/21/2004; Case Number 04-70640, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/03/2004, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 01/22/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
05/20/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 7 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone). Hearing scheduled 7/14/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
11
05/21/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/21/2016.
12
05/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone). Notice Date 05/22/2016.
13
05/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/22/2016.
14
05/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/22/2016.
15
05/23/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
16
06/23/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 6/22/2016.
17
06/23/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
18
06/23/2016
Debtor's Objection to Claim 3 of creditor Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $3,054.16 Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone. (Shinn, J.)
19
06/24/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone). Hearing scheduled 7/28/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
06/26/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/26/2016.
21
06/27/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.
22
06/27/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/14/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
23
06/29/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/29/2016.
24
07/12/2016
Order Withdrawing Motion to Determine Value of Security of 2008 Chrysler 300 financed by Motors Acceptance (Related Doc # 7) Signed on 7/12/2016.
25
07/14/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Notice Date 07/14/2016.
26
07/15/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/14/2016 11:08:33 AM ]. File Size [ 412 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:09 ]. (RE: Doc #21; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case (insufficient notice time)). (adiuser).
27
07/18/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
28
07/22/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 7/22/2016 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 17 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone, 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
29
07/24/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/24/2016.
30
07/25/2016
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 3 - Debtor's Objection is Withdrawn. Signed on 7/25/2016 (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone).
31
07/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/27/2016.
32
12/19/2017
Motion to Surrender Filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone (Shinn, J.)
34
12/20/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
35
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
36
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 9:57:08 AM ]. File Size [ 84 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:14 ]. (RE: Doc #32; Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral - 2008 Chrysler 300 - Motors Acceptance). (adiuser).
37
01/22/2018
Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral - 2008 Chrysler 300 - Motors Acceptance. Signed on 1/22/2018 (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Rolanda Ann Rhone).
38
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[37] Order Granting). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.