Rolanda J Dargan-Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00342 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/09/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/09/2018
Generic Motion / Application
10/09/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/09/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
10/09/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
10/10/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
10/15/2018
Generic Motion
10/15/2018
Update Deadline (Installment Payments) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/24/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/24/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
10/26/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/01/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/01/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
11/02/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
11/09/2018
Entry of Appearance
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
11/15/2018
Entry of Appearance
23
11/15/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
24
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/06/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
27
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.