Rolanda Jeanette Dargan-Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00212 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/06/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
07/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/07/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
07/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/11/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
8
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/17/2018
Entry of Appearance
13
07/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
14
07/23/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
15
07/23/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
07/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/25/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
17
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/15/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/17/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
08/17/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
21
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
09/05/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
09/10/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.