Rolanda Jeanette Dargan-Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00273 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
08/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
08/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
08/22/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/22/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
08/22/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
08/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
08/24/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
8
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
08/27/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
13
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
08/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
09/05/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
09/13/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.