Rommel S Garcia
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00394 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/08/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
11/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
11/08/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
11/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/08/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
11/08/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/09/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
11/28/2018
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
14
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
12/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.