Ronald Dale Norwood, sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

7:2018-bk-70154 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 187 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/04/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Ronald Dale Norwood Sr.
3
02/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Ronald Dale Norwood Sr.
4
02/04/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ronald Dale Norwood Sr.
02/04/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-70154-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21680196. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/02/2018 at 08:30 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 1502 Tuscaloosa. Objections for Discharge due by 05/01/2018.
6
02/05/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
02/05/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Ronald Dale Norwood, Sr. Case Number 88-00448, Chapter 7 filed in Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court on 05/04/1988; Case Number 07-04907, Chapter 7 filed in Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court on 05/29/2007, Standard Discharge on 08/06/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/05/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Signed on 2/5/2018.
8
02/05/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
9
02/06/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
10
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
11
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
12
03/02/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Robert A. Morgan, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 20000.00, Assets Exempt: $ 1925.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 67949.55, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 67949.55.
13
05/02/2018
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 5/2/2018 (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)).
14
05/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 05/04/2018.
15
05/18/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.