Ronald Lee Phillips
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00184 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
06/14/2018
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/14/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
06/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
06/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
06/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
06/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
06/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
06/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
06/17/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
06/19/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
11
06/19/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/25/2018
Clerks Notice
06/26/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/27/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
15
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
07/03/2018
Schedule I (Form 106I)
18
07/03/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
07/03/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
20
07/03/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
21
07/03/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
22
07/03/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
07/06/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
07/06/2018
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
07/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/06/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
07/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/24/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
08/01/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
29
08/01/2018
Reconsider Dismissal of Case (CM17)
30
08/02/2018
Reconsider Dismissal of Case
08/03/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
08/07/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
33
08/08/2018
Reconsider Dismissal of Case
34
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
08/23/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
36
08/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.