Ronald Lee Phillips
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00338 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/05/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
10/05/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/06/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/08/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/12/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
10/30/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
14
11/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
15
11/05/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
11/05/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
17
11/05/2018
Certificate of Service
11/05/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
11/15/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
11/15/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/16/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
22
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
23
11/19/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
11/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/19/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
12/19/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/03/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
27
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
01/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
01/14/2019
Relief from Stay
01/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
01/23/2019
Reconsider
31
01/23/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
32
01/23/2019
Reconsider
33
01/23/2019
Generic Motion / Application
34
01/23/2019
Generic Motion / Application
35
01/23/2019
Memorandum in Support
36
02/12/2019
Generic Motion / Application
37
02/13/2019
Generic Motion / Application
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
03/06/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
39
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
40
03/21/2019
Reconsider
41
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.