Ronnie Lee Wieber, II
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00074 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/04/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
13
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/08/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/19/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
06/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
06/25/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/28/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.