Roosevelt Morrow
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04758 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/04/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Roosevelt Morrow
2
11/04/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.
3
11/04/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow
5
11/04/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.
6
11/04/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.
7
11/04/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.
8
11/04/2017
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow
9
11/04/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2008 Honda CR-V financed by ACIPCO Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow
10
11/04/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.
11
11/04/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/03/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
12
11/05/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/06/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Roosevelt Morrow Case Number 16-02871, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/15/2016; Case Number 13-00288, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/24/2013, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/12/2015; Case Number 09-00785, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/11/2009, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 09/28/2010; Case Number 15-00117, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/12/2015, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/19/2016.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/06/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow).
14
11/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 9 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
15
11/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow). Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
17
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
18
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
19
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
20
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 14 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
21
11/13/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
22
11/21/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank.
23
11/30/2017
ORDER Granting Signed on 11/30/2017 RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
24
11/30/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/30/2017 10:45:29 AM ]. File Size [ 231 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:38 ]. (RE: Doc #8; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
25
12/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Granting). Notice Date 12/02/2017.
26
12/14/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc) Modified on 12/14/2017
27
12/14/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY incorrect date Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 26 Meeting of Creditors Held). (Ch13troffice, bc)
28
12/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/13/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
29
12/18/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
30
12/19/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 29 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
31
12/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/21/2017.
32
01/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow.).
33
01/03/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
34
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 11:21:18 AM ]. File Size [ 1342 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:44 ]. (RE: Doc #9; Debtor's Motion to Determine Value - 2008 Honda CR-V - ACIPCO). (adiuser).
35
01/19/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing Debtor's Motion to Determine Value of Collateral is Withdrawn in Open Court. Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case is Withdrawn in Open Court. Confirmation Hearing is Continued to March 1, 2018 at 11:15 AM Signed on 1/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 9 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow, 11 Confirmation Hearing, 29 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
37
01/29/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor ACIPCO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
38
01/29/2018
Affidavit Filed by Creditor ACIPCO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
39
01/29/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor ACIPCO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
01/29/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04758-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21657045. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 37) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
01/30/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by ACIPCO Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor ACIPCO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
42
02/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/01/2018.
02/08/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04758-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
02/09/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 13 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
44
02/21/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Michael Harrison to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #37; Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Michael Harrison, Attorney for ACIPCO Federal Credit Union
45
02/26/2018
Consent Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 37) Signed on 2/26/2018.
46
02/28/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
47
02/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 02/28/2018.
48
03/06/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 3/6/2018 (RE: related document(s) 29 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 32 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roosevelt Morrow, Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27)).
49
03/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/08/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.