Rosanna Marie Angus
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00408 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/28/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/28/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/28/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
11/28/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/29/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
11/29/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
11/29/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
11/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/04/2018
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
12/04/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/27/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/28/2018
Notice of Deficiency In Filing Requirements
15
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
01/07/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
01/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/11/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
18
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
02/22/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
21
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
02/25/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
03/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/11/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
24
03/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
03/15/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.