Rosemary McGowan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00025 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
06/06/2018
Extend Time
19
06/07/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
20
06/07/2018
Extend Time
21
06/08/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
22
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
24
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
07/12/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
26
07/13/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
27
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/18/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
07/18/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
29
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/23/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.