Ross Frank Arter
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00020 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/22/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/22/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
01/22/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
4
01/22/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
01/22/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/23/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
01/23/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
01/23/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
01/23/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
01/30/2019
Schedules A-J
14
01/30/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
15
01/30/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
01/30/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
17
01/30/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
01/30/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/30/2019
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
19
02/01/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
20
02/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/05/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
02/06/2019
Change of Address
02/06/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.