Ross Sullivan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

1:2018-bk-00042 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/07/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
24
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/11/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.