Roupe v. big Heart pet Brands, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California

3:2018-cv-01465 (cand)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 434 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
Exhibit A - B
2
Civil Cover Sheet
2 Attachments
2
03/07/2018
Proposed Summons.
3
03/07/2018
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2018.
4
03/08/2018
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.
5
03/08/2018
Summons Issued as to Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.