Rubey v. Brennan
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00076 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/07/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
14
08/08/2018
Witness List
15
08/08/2018
Witness List
16
08/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
17
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
18
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
19
08/10/2018
Summary Judgment
20
08/10/2018
Pretrial Order
21
09/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
22
09/04/2018
Declaration
23
09/04/2018
Affidavit
24
09/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
09/18/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/28/2018
Leave to File Document
10/15/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/18/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
29
11/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
30
12/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
12/13/2018
Scheduling Order
33
01/25/2019
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
34
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
35
03/04/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
36
03/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
37
03/18/2019
Exhibit List
38
03/18/2019
Witness List
39
03/18/2019
Exhibit List
40
03/18/2019
Witness List
41
03/19/2019
Errata
42
03/21/2019
Notice of Appearance
43
03/25/2019
Trial Brief
03/28/2019
Pretrial Conference - Final (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
03/31/2019
Trial Brief
46
04/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
47
04/09/2019
Bench Trial - Held
48
04/10/2019
Notice (Other)
49
04/11/2019
Bench Trial - Held
50
04/11/2019
Witness List
51
04/11/2019
Exhibit List
52
04/11/2019
Exhibit List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.