Rucker v. Indorama Ventures Xylenes & Pta, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2017-cv-02144 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 365 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
12/20/2017
Request for service by certified mail filed by Kuryakin C. Rucker. (SPT)
12/21/2017
Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601003330 (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/21/2017
Summons Issued as to Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC by Clerk for service by certified mail. (SPT)
4
01/02/2018
SUMMONS Returned Executed Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC served on 12/26/2017, answer due 1/16/2018.
5
01/16/2018
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
6
01/16/2018
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC
7
01/18/2018
ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 01/18/18. (SPT)
8
01/18/2018
ORDER that a telephone status conference is set for 9:30 AM on Thursday, February 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 01/18/18. (SPT)
9
01/18/2018
ORDER that the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than March 2, 2018, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 01/18/18. (SPT)
02/15/2018
TEXT ORDER that the telephone status conference set for 2/15/18 at 9:30 AM is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/15/18. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/16/2018
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the case has been randomly reassigned to Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr.; Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to the case; Please use case number 5:17-cv-2144-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. (SPT)
11
02/16/2018
ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 2/16/2018.
12
02/22/2018
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
13
02/28/2018
SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 11/1/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2018; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 1/4/2019; Trial ready by 2/2019. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 2/28/2018. (AHI)
14
03/15/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records
15
04/13/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Modified on 4/13/2018
16
05/15/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time (AHI).
17
09/14/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records Modified on 9/17/2018
18
10/15/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records Modified on 10/17/2018
19
10/25/2018
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
20
10/31/2018
STIPULATION AND CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER that certain documents and information shall remain confidential as set out in this order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/30/2018.
21
11/15/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records
22
12/03/2018
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
23
12/03/2018
Brief re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
24
12/03/2018
Evidentiary Material re: 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 23 Brief.
1
Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Deposition and Exhibits
2
Exhibit 2 - Tammi L. Harrison's Deposition and Exhibits
3
Exhibit 3 - Russell S. Wilson's Deposition and Exhibits
4
Exhibit 4 - Rebecca V. Shelton's Deposition and Exhibits (Part 1)
5
Exhibit 4 - Rebecca V. Shelton's Deposition and Exhibits (Part 2)
6
Exhibit 5 - January 5, 2016 Email from Dave Gibbs to Plaintiff
7
Exhibit 6 - Srinivasan Prabhushankar's Deposition and Exhibits
8
Exhibit 7 - Nondiscrimination and Anti-Harassment Policy
9
Exhibit 8 - Excerpt from Purchase and Sale Agreement
10
Exhibit 9 - March 2, 2016 Email from Plaintiff to Tammi Harrison
11
Exhibit 10 - Indorama Educational Assistance Policy
12
Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff's Request for Tuition Reimbursement
13
Exhibit 12 - Plaintiff's 2016 Performance Evaluation
14
Exhibit 13 - Plaintiff's Pay Discussion Guide
15
Exhibit 14 - Plaintiff's Resignation Email
15 Attachments
25
12/04/2018
ORDER re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC. Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to the motion no later than December 26, 2018. The reply is due no later than January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 12/4/18.
26
12/14/2018
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records Modified on 12/17/2018
27
12/19/2018
MOTION to Withdraw by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
28
12/26/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kuryakin C. Rucker.
29
12/26/2018
Evidentiary Material re: 28 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment.
1
Exhibit Ex. A - Rucker depo
2
Exhibit Ex. B, Vol. 1 - Shelton depo
3
Exhibit Ex. B, Vol. 2 - Shelton depo
4
Exhibit Ex. B, Vol. 3 - Shelton depo
5
Exhibit Ex. B, Vol. 4 - Shelton depo
6
Exhibit Ex. C - Wilson depo
7
Exhibit Ex. D - Prabhushankar depo
8
Exhibit Ex. E - Harrison depo
9
Affidavit Ex. F - Affidavit of Phil DeFatta
10
Exhibit Ex. G - Declaration of K.C. Rucker
10 Attachments
30
01/03/2019
ORDER that the 27 Motion to Withdraw as attorney of record by Mitesh B. Shah for Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 1/3/2019. (AHI)
31
01/03/2019
Witness List and Exhibit List by Kuryakin C. Rucker.
32
01/04/2019
Witness List by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
33
01/04/2019
Exhibit List by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
34
01/07/2019
RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Indorama Ventures Xylenes & PTA, LLC.
35
01/15/2019
NOTICE by Kuryakin C. Rucker of Attorney Time Records Modified on 1/16/2019
36
01/18/2019
PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTONS TO DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST by Kuryakin C. Rucker.
37
01/18/2019
Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Exhibit List by Kuryakin C. Rucker.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.