Rush v. State of Alaska, Department of Health and Social Services
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00233 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/21/2018
Witness List
31
05/22/2018
Witness List
32
06/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
33
07/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
34
07/10/2018
Affidavit
35
07/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
36
08/01/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
37
08/03/2018
Compel
38
08/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
39
08/17/2018
Affidavit
40
08/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
41
08/22/2018
Errata
43
08/31/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
44
08/31/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
49
09/12/2018
Errata
50
10/01/2018
Order
51
10/01/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
53
10/01/2018
Affidavit
54
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
55
10/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
10/12/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.