Ruth Correa
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00052 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
06/05/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
14
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
06/20/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.