Ryan Kendrick Riggs
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

3:2016-cr-00348 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 727 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
09/20/2016
Case unsealed as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs pursuant to notice from USMS of detainer lodged with Muscogee County Jail, Georgia. (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
09/20/2016
Detainer Lodged as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs
90
09/21/2016
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
91
09/22/2016
ORDER granting 90 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs (6). Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/22/16.
92
09/22/2016
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs for Arraignment on 10/28/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody.
102
10/13/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert T Ray appearing for Ryan Kendrick Riggs
104
10/13/2016
MOTION to Continue trial(Unopposed) by USA as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr.
108
10/19/2016
ORDER as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs that arraignment set for October 28, 2016, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody, is reset for October 21, 2016, at 1:30 PM, in Courtroom 5A, before Magistrate Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/19/16.
111
10/19/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr:Initial Appearance as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs held on 10/19/2016 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 1:22 - 1:24.)
117
10/21/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr:Arraignment as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs (6) Count 1 held on 10/21/2016, Plea entered by Ryan Kendrick Riggs Not Guilty on count 1. (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 1:57 - 2:00.)
118
10/25/2016
TEXT ORDER denying as premature the government's 104 Motion to Continue Trial as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs. No trial date has been set as to this defendant. Entered by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/25/16. (No PDF attached)
119
10/25/2016
ORDER ON ARRAIGNMENT TO INCLUDE ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs. Time excluded from 10/25/16 until 3/20/17. Setting an initial Pretrial Conference for 2/8/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2017 10:00 AM in Opelika, Alabama before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Pretrial Motions due by 11/8/2016. Discovery due from the government by 10/24/2016 and from the defendant by 10/31/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/25/16.
139
11/16/2016
ORDER to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs set for 11/29/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2D before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/16/16. (Main Document 139 replaced on 11/17/2016).
170
11/29/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden:Arraignment as to Dywane Lamont Turner (1) Count 1s, RT Ray (3) Count 1s, James Wesley Meadows Jr. (4) Count 1s, and Ryan Kendrick Riggs (6) Count 1s held on 11/29/2016, Plea entered by Dywane Lamont Turner, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs -Not Guilty on count 1s. (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time FTR: 10:36 AM - 10:43 AM)
172
11/29/2016
NOTICE TO RETAINED CRIMINAL DEFENSE ATTORNEY ROBERT T. RAY as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs
226
01/17/2017
ORDER as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta. ORDERED that jury selection and trial are specially set for March 20, 2017, at 10:00 AM, in courtroom 2-B of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. The jury will be selected from the Eastern Division jury pool. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/17/17.
258
02/06/2017
SEALED DOCUMENT by USA as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
259
02/06/2017
ORDER re 258 SEALED DOCUMENT as to Ryan Kendrick Riggs (6). Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/6/17.
264
02/08/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr:Pretrial Conference as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta held on 2/8/2017 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 9:18 - 9:28.)
268
02/10/2017
SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta. Jury Selection and Trial (ETT 3 weeks) set for 3/20/2017 10:00 AM in 2B before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Notice of Intent to Change Plea due by noon on 3/8/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/10/17.
284
02/22/2017
ORDER as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta re 278 MOTION to Continue trial filed by Vivian Ruvalcaba, 280 MOTION to Continue trial filed by Jessie Acosta. ORDERED that, on or before March 1, 2017, all Defendants other than Defendants Ruvulcaba and Jessie Acosta shall respond to the pending motions to continue. (Doc. # 278; Doc. # 280.) The response of any Defendant who wishes to seek a continuance1 must either contain or be filed contemporaneously with a well-supported motion to continue. If the Government seeks a continuance of some or all cases, it shall file a motion to continue on or before March 1, 2017. The Government should respond to any Defendants motion to continue no later than March 8, 2016. Pending the ruling on the motions to continue, jury selection and trial remain set for March 20, 2017, at 10:00 AM, in courtroom 2-B of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. The jury pool will be selected from the Eastern Division. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/22/17.
289
02/23/2017
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Dywane Lamont Turner as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Danny Shane Lavender, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta re 284 Order, Set Deadlines
295
02/27/2017
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Ryan Kendrick Riggs re 284 Order, Set Deadlines
298
03/02/2017
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, Joseph Acosta. Time excluded from 3/20/17 until 8/7/17. Granting 292, 278, 280 and 288 Motions to Continue Trial. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2017 is CONTINUED to 8/7/2017 10:00 AM in Opelika, Alabama before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/2/17.
300
03/03/2017
ORDER as to Dywane Lamont Turner, Shauntell Martrece Walker, RT Ray, James Wesley Meadows, Jr, Ivan Dewayne Green, Jr, Ryan Kendrick Riggs, Christopher Bernard Adams, Robert Williams, Jr, Calvin Quintez Ashford, Yasmin Jenean Walker, Melvin John Williams, Jr, Jessie Acosta, Vivian Ruvalcaba, and Joseph Acosta, setting a final Pretrial Conference for 5/31/2017 09:00 AM in 5A before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr. Counsel for all Defendants who have not yet entered pleas of guilty in this matter shall attend. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/3/17.
05/29/2018
Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Order on Motion for Variance (Text entry; no document attached.)
609
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
610
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
611
06/01/2018
Judgment
613
06/26/2018
Seal
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
618
07/02/2018
Reduction in Criminal Offense Level
619
07/02/2018
Reduction in Criminal Offense Level
620
07/05/2018
Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY
07/09/2018
Order on Motion to Seal (Text entry; no document attached.)
623
07/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
625
07/16/2018
Judgment
627
07/16/2018
Order
629
07/25/2018
Order Appointing Panel Attorney
630
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
634
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.