S&B Surgery Center
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2009-bk-19825 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Substitution of attorney
05/30/2018
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
405
09/28/2018
X - Extend Time (Generic) (motion)
406
09/28/2018
Notice of motion/application
10/01/2018
Hearing Set(Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
408
10/17/2018
Response
11/01/2018
Hearing Held (Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
412
11/14/2018
Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11/16/2018
Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
415
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.