S M Robinson, Jr. and Christa Robinson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Mississippi (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-04824 (mssb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/18/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of S m Robinson, jr. and Christa Robinson
7
12/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13
8
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice
9
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
10
01/02/2019
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
11
01/03/2019
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
15
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
01/24/2019
Meeting of Creditors Held (batch) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/13/2019
Set/Reset/Continue Hearing
24
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
03/10/2019
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (ADI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Requirement to file Official Form 423 form)
31
03/26/2019
Relief from Stay
33
03/26/2019
Hearing Set (KMS)
34
03/29/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Bankruptcy)
35
04/02/2019
Relief from Stay
36
04/02/2019
Objection to Confirmation
37
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
38
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
51
05/10/2019
Chapter 13 Trustee Report and Account of Prior Administration of Case
52
05/17/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
53
05/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice Confirming Plan
54
05/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.