S&O Construction Services Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of New York

7:2018-cv-05836 (nysd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/27/2018
Notice of Removal
2
06/27/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/27/2018
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
06/28/2018
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/10/2018
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
5
07/10/2018
Confirm Arbitration
6
07/10/2018
Affidavit in Support of Motion
7
07/10/2018
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
8
07/10/2018
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
9
08/14/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
08/14/2018
Letter
11
08/14/2018
Proposed Order
08/14/2018
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/15/2018
Letter
13
08/15/2018
Letter
14
08/15/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
15
08/31/2018
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
17
12/04/2018
OPINION AND ORDER re: 5 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Notice of Motion-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by S&O Construction Services Inc. For the reasons set forth above, Petitioner's motion to confirm the arbitrati on award in the amount of $606,007.10 with interest at 9% from May 3, 2018, is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed enter judgment in favor of Petitioner, terminate the pending motion, (Doc. 5), and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/4/2018) (ne) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.