S & S Marketing Services, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

9:2018-bk-15703 (flsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
1
05/11/2018
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition of S & s Marketing Services, Inc.
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Hearing by Filer
25
01/22/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
26
01/30/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
27
02/22/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
29
03/15/2019
Notice of Hearing (BK)
30
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
43
05/07/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
44
05/07/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
45
05/13/2019
Debtor in Possession Report
05/20/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.