Sabrina R King
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81692 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
2
06/08/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
3
06/08/2018
Statement of Attorney for Debtor in a Chapter 13
4
06/08/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
6
06/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
06/08/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/19/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
31
09/04/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
42
10/19/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.