Saensinbandit v. Alaska Airlines
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00267 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/09/2018
Complaint
2
11/09/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
11/09/2018
Unissued Summons
11/09/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/27/2018
Order
5
11/27/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
12/04/2018
Answer to Complaint
7
12/04/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
8
12/04/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
01/02/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10
01/03/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.