Sagoonick et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00052 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
07/17/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
19
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
04/03/2019
Status Report
04/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
04/05/2019
Trial Management Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.