Salix Capital US Inc. v. Banc of America Securities, LL

2017-02381 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 234 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. [2093841] [17-2381]--[Edited 08/04/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/04/2017 12:31 PM]
2
07/31/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., district court receipt # 0208-13956345, FILED.[2093855] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/04/2017 12:39 PM]
3
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2093858] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/04/2017 12:41 PM]
4
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2093861] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/04/2017 12:42 PM]
5
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2093864] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/04/2017 12:44 PM]
6
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099106] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:42 PM]
7
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099117] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:45 PM]
8
08/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100024] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/14/2017 02:30 PM]
9
08/14/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100163] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:27 PM]
11
08/14/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [6], on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED.[2100210] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:41 PM]
14
08/14/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100506] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/14/2017 05:23 PM]
16
08/15/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [14], on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED.[2101126] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 01:29 PM]
18
08/15/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101210] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:37 PM]
19
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101234] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:48 PM]
21
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101313] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:26 PM]
22
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2381, [19], ADDED.[2101343] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:36 PM]
23
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) Inc. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101592] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:07 PM]
24
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [23], in place of attorney Elai Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[2101689] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:52 AM]
26
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [21], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED.[2102231] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 01:43 PM]
27
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102451] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:23 PM]
28
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102582] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:03 PM]
29
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, request that Norinchukin be removed from the caption, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102590] [17-2381]--[Edited 08/17/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:29 PM]
30
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, request that BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association be removed as appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102606] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:48 PM]
31
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102618] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:06 PM]
32
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada and RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102647] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:20 PM]
33
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102812] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:53 AM]
34
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102999] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:13 AM]
35
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103011] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:16 AM]
36
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103018] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:19 AM]
37
08/17/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, withdrawl as counsel, parties will be represented by counsel from WilmerHale, RECEIVED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103058] [17-2381]--[Edited 08/18/2017 by TT]--[Edited 08/18/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:35 AM]
42
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103365] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:38 PM]
43
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103372] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:42 PM]
44
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103389] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:50 PM]
45
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento, [33], in place of attorney Edwin R. DeYoung, SUBSTITUTED.[2104029] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:17 AM]
46
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2381, [35], ADDED.[2104118] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:00 AM]
47
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2381, [36], ADDED.[2104130] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:05 AM]
48
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2381, [43], ADDED.[2104173] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:24 AM]
49
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104519] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:04 PM]
50
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104539] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:11 PM]
51
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104540] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:12 PM]
52
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104556] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:22 PM]
53
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104569] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:28 PM]
54
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104581] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:34 PM]
55
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Banc of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Banc of America Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104609] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:47 PM]
56
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104614] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:49 PM]
57
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104630] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:55 PM]
58
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert G. Houck, for Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, TERMINATED.[2104635] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:57 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104690] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:20 PM]
61
08/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [44], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2104864] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:38 PM]
62
08/18/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America, N.A., Banc of America Corporation and Banc of America Securities, LLC, informing the Court they are not parties to this appeal also request that Robert Frank Wise, Arthur Joseph Burke and the Firm of Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP be removed as counsel of record for certain entities, RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104882] [17-2381]--[Edited 08/21/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:53 PM]
63
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104994] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/18/2017 08:28 PM]
64
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2381, [59], ADDED.[2105021] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/19/2017 01:00 PM]
65
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2381, [49], ADDED.[2105043] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:07 AM]
66
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeremy Andersen for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2381, [50], ADDED.[2105047] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:28 AM]
67
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2381, [51], ADDED.[2105048] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:32 AM]
68
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Steig David Olson for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2381, [52], ADDED.[2105052] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 11:39 AM]
69
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2381, [53], ADDED.[2105053] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 11:45 AM]
70
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2381, [54], ADDED.[2105059] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/20/2017 02:35 PM]
71
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Wise for Portigon AG, Arthur Joseph Burke for Royal Bank of Canada and Arthur Joseph Burke for WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, TERMINATED.[2105113] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/21/2017 08:41 AM]
73
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert T. Smith, [32], in place of attorney Brian J. Poronsky, SUBSTITUTED.[2105309] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:56 AM]
76
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2381, [57], ADDED.[2105930] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:27 PM]
77
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106473] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/21/2017 11:44 PM]
78
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107502] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:55 PM]
79
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Paparella, [77], in place of attorney David Hugh Stern, SUBSTITUTED.[2107833] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:18 PM]
80
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107888] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:42 PM]
81
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108941] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:39 PM]
88
08/24/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [81], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109691] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:12 PM]
90
08/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada and RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109835] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/24/2017 08:25 PM]
91
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for RBC Capital Markets LLC Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2381, [90], ADDED.[2110268] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/25/2017 01:02 PM]
92
08/25/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [88], [90], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2110272] [17-2381] [Entered: 08/25/2017 01:05 PM]
93
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
94
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113039] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:46 PM]
95
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [94], ADDED.[2113695] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:28 PM]
96
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [93], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
97
09/05/2017
NOTICE, to Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citizens Bank N.A., HBOS plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, and Societe Generale, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2116474] [17-2381]--[Edited 09/05/2017 by TT]--[Edited 09/05/2017 by TT] [Entered: 09/05/2017 09:56 AM]
98
09/05/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [77], [62], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2116486] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/05/2017 10:02 AM]
99
09/05/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569 containing complete set of docket entries.[2116575] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/05/2017 10:49 AM]
100
09/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan E. Schoenfeld for Appellee Citizens Bank N.A., in case 17-2381, [1], ADDED.[2116600] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/05/2017 11:01 AM]
101
09/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert G. Houck for Appellee RBS Securities Inc., in case 17-2381, [1], ADDED.[2116601] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/05/2017 11:04 AM]
104
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
105
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
107
09/05/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2117121] [17-2381, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/05/2017 03:45 PM]
108
09/06/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, these entities are not parties to the Salix Appeals, RECEIVED. Service date 09/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[2117730] [17-2381]--[Edited 09/06/2017 by TT] [Entered: 09/06/2017 11:36 AM]
109
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
110
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [2121293-2], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
111
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
112
09/12/2017
LETTER, dated 09/12/2017 on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., regarding party designation, RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2122283] [17-2381]--[Edited 09/15/2017 by BM] [Entered: 09/12/2017 11:25 AM]
113
09/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Wiseman for Citigroup Inc. Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. Citibank, N.A., in case 17-2381, [111], ADDED.[2125169] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/15/2017 08:55 AM]
114
09/18/2017
LETTER, dated 09/18/2017 on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, regarding party designations, RECEIVED. Service date 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2127387] [17-2381] [Entered: 09/18/2017 05:12 PM]
116
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric F. Citron for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2142980-2], ADDED.[2143575] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 02:48 PM]
117
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Goldstein for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2142992-2], ADDED.[2143599] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 02:55 PM]
118
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Charles Hardy Davis for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2143135-2], ADDED.[2143619] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:01 PM]
119
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Charles Hardy Davis for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2143135-2], ADDED.[2143619] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:01 PM]
120
10/10/2017
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 10/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2144005] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 09:02 PM]
117
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric F. Citron for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2142980-2], ADDED.[2143575] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 02:48 PM]
118
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Goldstein for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2142992-2], ADDED.[2143599] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 02:55 PM]
119
10/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Charles Hardy Davis for Schwab Cash Reserves Schwab Total Bond Market Fund Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund The Charles Schwab Corporation Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Schwab Money Market Fund Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves Charles Schwab Bank, N.A. Schwab YieldPlus Fund Schwab Investor Money Fund, in case 17-1569, [2143135-2], ADDED.[2143619] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:01 PM]
124
10/11/2017
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [120] filed by Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, by RKW, FILED. [2144616][124] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/11/2017 11:51 AM]
125
10/16/2017
CAPTION, regarding Defendant UBS AG, AMENDED.[2148266] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/16/2017 02:22 PM]
126
10/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc in 17-1569, 17-1915, Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee HBOS plc in 17-2343, 17-2376, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 10/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2148457] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/16/2017 04:15 PM]
127
10/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Neal Kumar Katyal for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569, [2148434-2], ADDED.[2148702] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/17/2017 08:57 AM]
128
10/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group PLC, in case 17-2343 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915 Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [126], ADDED.[2148748] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/17/2017 09:14 AM]
129
10/24/2017
CAPTION, regarding Defendant - Appellee UBS AG, AMENDED.[2155416] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 10/24/2017 03:00 PM]
130
11/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169826] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/10/2017 01:00 PM]
131
11/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, 17-1989, FILED. Service date 11/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169829] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/10/2017 01:17 PM]
132
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2383, 17-2413, 17-2347, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2169995] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2352, 17-2351, 17-2381, 17-2360, 17-2383, 17-2413, 17-2347] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:09 AM]
133
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170005] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:16 AM]
134
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170021] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:21 AM]
135
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1569, -- Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-1915, Barclays Bank PLC in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC in 17-2343, 17-2347, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and -- Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2351, 17-2352, Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC in 17-2360, 17-2381, Appellee Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170027] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:25 AM]
136
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and Appellant David E. Sundstrom in 17-2413, -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, San Diego Association of Governments, The County of Mendocino and Appellant City of Houston and David E. Sundstrom in 17-1569, -- City of Richmond, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170226] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 11/13/2017 10:58 AM]
137
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, San Diego Association of Governments and Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston and Riverside Public Financing Authority in 17-1569, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and Regents of the University of California in 17-1915, 17-2056, -- City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, Regents of the University of California and Appellant California Public Plaintiffs and The County of Mendocino in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2170286] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 11:26 AM]
138
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1569 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2413 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2056 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989 Robert S. Kitchenoff for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1915, [130], ADDED.[2170761] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 03:41 PM]
139
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1569 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2413 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-2056 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1989 David H. Weinstein for Ellen Gelboim Linda Zacher, in case 17-1915, [131], ADDED.[2170824] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:03 PM]
140
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1989 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1569 Mary Beth Forshaw for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2352 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2351 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2381 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2383 Mary Beth Forshaw for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2360, [2169838-2], [2169837-2], [2169836-2], [2169835-2], ADDED.[2170873] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:13 PM]
141
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeremy Andersen for Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Capital Ventures International Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169881-2], ADDED.[2170942] [17-1569, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:34 PM]
142
11/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for City of Philadelphia Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169877-2], [2169876-2], ADDED.[2170963] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:44 PM]
143
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 32, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171008] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:13 PM]
144
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 32, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171010] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:17 PM]
145
11/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes, Gary Francis and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-2056, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2171019] [17-2056, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2343, 17-1989, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:24 PM]
146
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 32, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171021] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:27 PM]
147
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 32, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171025] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:30 PM]
148
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 32, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171029] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:34 PM]
149
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 32, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171036] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:40 PM]
150
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 32, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171044] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:54 PM]
151
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 32, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171047] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:00 PM]
152
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 32, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171049] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:04 PM]
153
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 32, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171057] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:08 PM]
154
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 32, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171058] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:11 PM]
155
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 32, (pp. 3301-3600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171061] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:13 PM]
156
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 32, (pp. 3601-3900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171063] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:16 PM]
157
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 32, (pp. 3901-4200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171064] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:19 PM]
158
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 32, (pp. 4201-4500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171067] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:22 PM]
159
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 32, (pp. 4501-4800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171071] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:25 PM]
160
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 32, (pp. 4801-5100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171072] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:31 PM]
161
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 32, (pp. 5101-5400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171077] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:35 PM]
162
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 32, (pp. 5401-5700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171079] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:53 PM]
163
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 32, (pp. 5701-6000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171081] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 06:59 PM]
164
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 32, (pp. 5701-6000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171082] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:11 PM]
165
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 32, (pp. 6001-6300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171084] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:19 PM]
166
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 22 of 32, (pp. 6301-6600), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171087] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:33 PM]
167
11/13/2017
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Joint Appendix (Filed Under Seal), on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-1569, 17-2056, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by US mail.[2171093] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:48 PM]
168
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 23 of 32, (pp. 6601-6900), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171095] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:16 PM]
169
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 24 of 32, (pp. 6901-7200), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171096] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:18 PM]
170
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 25 of 32, (pp. 7201-7500), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171097] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:25 PM]
171
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 26 of 32, (pp. 7501-7800), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171099] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:26 PM]
172
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 27 of 32, (pp. 7801-8100), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171103] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:35 PM]
173
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 28 of 32, (pp. 8101-8400), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171104] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:36 PM]
174
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 29 of 32, (pp. 8401-8700), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171106] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:43 PM]
175
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 30 of 32, (pp. 8701-9000), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171109] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:53 PM]
176
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 31 of 32, (pp. 9001-9300), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171110] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:54 PM]
177
11/13/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 32 of 32, (pp. 9301-9423), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171113] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 08:59 PM]
178
11/13/2017
SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171114] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:00 PM]
179
11/13/2017
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for CONFIDENTIAL JOINT BRIEF FOR PLAINTIFFS-APPELLANTS REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION (FILED UNDER SEAL), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171123] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 09:47 PM]
180
11/13/2017
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171131] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/13/2017 10:36 PM]
181
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Steig David Olson for Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Capital Ventures International Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169879-2], ADDED.[2171247] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:26 AM]
182
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for City of Philadelphia Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-1569, [2169880-2], ADDED.[2171261] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:32 AM]
183
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Capital Ventures International Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169881-2], ADDED.[2171285] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:47 AM]
184
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2413 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2351 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2056 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2381 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1915 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [132], ADDED.[2171303] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:56 AM]
185
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2351 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2056 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-1989 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [133], ADDED.[2171319] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 10:04 AM]
186
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2351 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-1915 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [134], ADDED.[2171387] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 10:26 AM]
187
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2351 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-1989 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [135], ADDED.[2171611] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 11:53 AM]
188
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander E. Barnett for The County of Mendocino County of Riverside City of Houston David E. Sundstrom City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments County of San Mateo, in case 17-1569 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District David E. Sundstrom Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-2413 Alexander E. Barnett for City of Houston, in case 17-2376 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-2056 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-1915, [136], ADDED.[2171696] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 12:39 PM]
189
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Martin McNeela for FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd Gary Francis 303030 Trading LLC Atlantic Trading USA, LLC FTC Futures Fund SICAV Nathaniel Haynes Metzler Investment GmbH, in case 17-1569 Andrew Martin McNeela for FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd Gary Francis FTC Futures Fund SICAV 303030 Trading LLC Atlantic Trading USA, LLC Nathaniel Haynes Metzler Investment GmbH, in case 17-2056, [145], ADDED.[2172129] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 04:54 PM]
190
11/14/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, JOINT APPENDIX, volume 32 of 32, [177], [163], on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation, FILED.[2172140] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 05:03 PM]
191
11/14/2017
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 32 of 32, (pp. 9301-9423), on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2172168] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 05:58 PM]
181
11/15/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: JOINT APPENDIX [190], on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED.[2172318] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 09:22 AM]
182
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for City of Philadelphia Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-1569, [2169880-2], ADDED.[2171261] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:32 AM]
183
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 Capital Ventures International Salix Capital US Inc. Darby Financial Products, in case 17-1569, [2169881-2], ADDED.[2171285] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:47 AM]
184
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2413 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2351 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2056 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-2381 David H. Braff for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1915 David H. Braff for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [132], ADDED.[2171303] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:56 AM]
185
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2351 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2056 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-1989 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Yvonne S. Quinn for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [133], ADDED.[2171319] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 10:04 AM]
186
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2351 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-1915 Jeffrey Thomas Scott for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [134], ADDED.[2171387] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 10:26 AM]
187
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-1569 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2347 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2413 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2352 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2351 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2343 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2376 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-2381 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC, in case 17-1989 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc., in case 17-2383 Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Banks PLC Barclays PLC, in case 17-2360, [135], ADDED.[2171611] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 11:53 AM]
188
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander E. Barnett for The County of Mendocino County of Riverside City of Houston David E. Sundstrom City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments County of San Mateo, in case 17-1569 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District David E. Sundstrom Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-2413 Alexander E. Barnett for City of Houston, in case 17-2376 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-2056 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California County of Riverside City of Richmond County of San Diego County of Sacramento San Diego Association of Governments Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority East Bay Municipal Utility District Riverside Public Financing Authority County of San Mateo County of Sonoma, in case 17-1915, [136], ADDED.[2171696] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 12:39 PM]
189
11/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Martin McNeela for FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd Gary Francis 303030 Trading LLC Atlantic Trading USA, LLC FTC Futures Fund SICAV Nathaniel Haynes Metzler Investment GmbH, in case 17-1569 Andrew Martin McNeela for FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd Gary Francis FTC Futures Fund SICAV 303030 Trading LLC Atlantic Trading USA, LLC Nathaniel Haynes Metzler Investment GmbH, in case 17-2056, [145], ADDED.[2172129] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/14/2017 04:54 PM]
197
11/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, The County of Mendocino, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-1569, -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, The County of Mendocino and -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2173096] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 03:30 PM]
192
11/15/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: JOINT APPENDIX [190], on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED.[2172318] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 09:22 AM]
197
11/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, The County of Mendocino, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-1569, -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-1915, 17-2056, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, The County of Mendocino and -- San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2173096] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 03:30 PM]
205
11/20/2017
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 11/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2175977] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/20/2017 01:34 PM]
207
11/20/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Sealed Brief, [193], on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989 FILED.[2176176] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/20/2017 03:15 PM]
208
11/20/2017
DISTRICT COURT SEALING ORDER, dated 08/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2176201] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/20/2017 03:25 PM]
209
11/20/2017
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, informing Court of proposed due date 02/12/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 11/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2176639] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/20/2017 08:03 PM]
210
11/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom and Direct Action Plaintiffs in 17-1569, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and Direct Action Plaintiffs in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 11/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2176641] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/20/2017 08:47 PM]
211
11/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California City of Houston County of Sacramento City of Richmond County of San Diego San Diego Association of Governments California Public Plaintiffs Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority David E. Sundstrom East Bay Municipal Utility District Riverside Public Financing Authority City of Riverside County of San Mateo Direct Action Plaintiffs County of Sonoma, in case 17-1569 Alexander E. Barnett for Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency Regents of the University of California City of Richmond County of Sacramento County of San Diego San Diego Association of Governments The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority California Public Plaintiffs East Bay Municipal Utility District David E. Sundstrom County of San Mateo Direct Action Plaintiffs County of Sonoma, in case 17-2413 Alexander E. Barnett for City of Houston, in case 17-2376, [210], ADDED.[2177745] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/21/2017 04:17 PM]
212
11/21/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Notice of Appearance [2174093-2], on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Houston, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Riverside Public Financing Authority, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom and Direct Action Plaintiffs in 17-1569, Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and Direct Action Plaintiffs in 17-2413, FILED.[2177751] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/21/2017 04:21 PM]
214
11/22/2017
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569 Brief due date as 02/12/2018, FILED.[2178572] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/22/2017 12:00 PM]
215
11/22/2017
MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 11/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2179134] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/22/2017 04:45 PM]
217
11/27/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: SEALED BRIEF, [207], on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation, FILED.[2179261] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 11/27/2017 09:08 AM]
219
12/04/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, 17-1915, Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, Appellee HBOS plc, Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2376, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 12/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2185586] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/04/2017 11:59 AM]
220
12/04/2017
RESPONSE TO MOTION, to seal document [215], on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-1569, -- JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-1989, 17-2056, Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association in 17-2343, Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-2347, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-2351, Appellee J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC in 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, -- J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 12/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2186252] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413]--[Edited 12/05/2017 by BM] [Entered: 12/04/2017 08:39 PM]
221
12/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2343 Allison Turbiville for Lloyds Bank plc HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc, in case 17-2381 Allison Turbiville for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915 Allison Turbiville for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [219], ADDED.[2186282] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/05/2017 08:53 AM]
225
12/11/2017
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [220], on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University in 17-1569, 17-1915, FILED. Service date 12/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2191871][225] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/11/2017 08:18 PM]
229
12/12/2017
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada in 17-1569, Appellee Royal Bank of Canada in 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, informing Court of proposed due date 02/12/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 12/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2192160] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/12/2017 10:52 AM]
230
12/12/2017
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, informing Court of proposed due date 02/12/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 12/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2192240] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/12/2017 11:24 AM]
232
12/14/2017
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., British Bankers' Association, Citi Swapco Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Group International, Credit Suisse International, Deutsche Bank AG, HBOS plc, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Banking Group plc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Portigon AG, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Rabobank Group, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, UBS Limited, UBS Securities LLC, WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG in 17-1569 Brief due date as 02/12/2018, FILED.[2194370] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 12/14/2017 11:13 AM]
233
01/17/2018
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215683] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 01/17/2018 11:08 PM]
234
01/19/2018
ATTORNEY, Mark A. Kirsch, [233], in place of attorney Peter Sullivan, SUBSTITUTED.[2216851] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 01/19/2018 10:16 AM]
235
02/08/2018
ATTORNEY, Richard D. Owens for British Bankers' Association BBA Enterprises, Ltd. BBA Libor, Ltd., in case 17-1569, [2231626-2], ADDED.[2231765] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 09:26 AM]
237
02/08/2018
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231975] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 11:57 AM]
238
02/08/2018
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to stay & remand [237], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, Linda Zacher in 17-1915, FILED.[2232058] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 12:32 PM]
239
02/08/2018
MOTION, to stay, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2232152] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 01:42 PM]
240
02/08/2018
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, [238], on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1569, FILED.[2232228] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 02:37 PM]
237
02/08/2018
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, 17-1569, -- Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231975] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/08/2018 11:57 AM]
242
02/12/2018
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, Appellee HBOS plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1915, Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, -- HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-2351, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/12/2018 by CM/ECF. [2234064] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/12/2018 07:36 PM]
243
02/12/2018
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, 17-1915, Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2376, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/12/2018 by CM/ECF. [2234077] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/12/2018 11:10 PM]
244
02/12/2018
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, 17-1915, Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2376, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 02/12/2018 by CM/ECF. [2234078] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/12/2018 11:12 PM]
245
02/14/2018
ATTORNEY, Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2351 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2343 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2381 Kirti Datla for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [242], ADDED.[2235919] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/14/2018 01:26 PM]
246
02/14/2018
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [2235302-2], on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank in 17-1569, FILED.[2235941] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/14/2018 01:36 PM]
245
02/14/2018
ATTORNEY, Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1569 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2351 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2343 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2381 Kirti Datla for Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1989 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915 Kirti Datla for HBOS plc Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2383, [242], ADDED.[2235919] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/14/2018 01:26 PM]
247
02/15/2018
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 02/15/2018 by CM/ECF. [2237025] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/15/2018 01:24 PM]
249
02/16/2018
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, TERMINATED.[2237566] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 08:53 AM]
250
02/16/2018
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: LETTER, [246], on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank in 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, The Norinchukin Bank in 17-2351, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED.[2237642] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 09:31 AM]
252
02/16/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until 03/16/2018 to file reply brief [247] filed by Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. [2237696][252] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 09:45 AM]
253
02/16/2018
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Neal Kumar Katyal, Esq. for Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 02/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2237803] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 10:38 AM]
254
02/16/2018
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Neal Kumar Katyal, Esq. for Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 02/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2237826] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 10:43 AM]
249
02/16/2018
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, TERMINATED.[2237566] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 08:53 AM]
250
02/16/2018
CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: LETTER, [246], on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank in 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, The Norinchukin Bank in 17-2351, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED.[2237642] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/16/2018 09:31 AM]
259
02/20/2018
MOTION ORDER, referring motion to seal document [215] filed by Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher, FILED. [2239085][259] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/20/2018 12:47 PM]
261
02/26/2018
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Thomas C. Goldstein, Esq. for Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Attorney Mr. Thomas C. Goldstein, Esq. for Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 02/26/2018 by CM/ECF. [2244379] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/26/2018 06:45 PM]
262
02/26/2018
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Arun S. Subramanian for Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 02/26/2018 by email. [2244398] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/26/2018 09:19 PM]
266
02/27/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for partial severance of the appeal as to Citibank, NA and Citigroup, Inc in docket number 17-1989 and remand the case to the district court for consideration of a settlement agreement [239] [239] filed by Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher. Appellants are directed to file a status update letter with the Court every 30 days beginning 30 days from the date of this order by DAL, FILED. [2244993][266] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/27/2018 01:17 PM]
267
02/27/2018
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/27/2018, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2244999] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/27/2018 01:20 PM]
272
03/16/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting Appellants request to remand only as between themselves and Appellees HSBC Holdings and HSBC Bank in dockets 17-1569 and 17-1915. [2252317-2] filed by Appellant Yale University, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc. and Vistra Energy Corporation in 17-1569, 17-1915. Appellants are directed to file a status update letter with the court every 30 days beginning 30 days from the date of this order by DAL, FILED. [2258550][272] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/16/2018 11:46 AM]
273
03/16/2018
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 03/16/2018, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2258560] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/16/2018 11:50 AM]
274
03/16/2018
MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 03/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2259166] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/16/2018 08:46 PM]
275
03/16/2018
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for CONFIDENTIAL JOINT REPLY BRIEF FOR PLAINTIFFS-APPELLANTS REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION (FILED UNDER SEAL), on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 03/16/2018 by email.[2259167] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/16/2018 08:48 PM]
276
03/16/2018
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 03/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2259171] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/16/2018 11:50 PM]
278
03/19/2018
NEW CASE MANAGER, Troy White, ASSIGNED.[2259554] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/19/2018 11:22 AM]
279
03/23/2018
REDACTED REPLY BRIEF regarding personal jurisdiction, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority in 17-2343, FILED. Service date 03/23/2018 by CM/ECF. [2263600] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/23/2018 02:43 PM]
282
03/28/2018
MOTION ORDER, referring the motion for leave to file the reply brief under seal [274] filed by Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, by RSP, FILED. [2266363][282] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/28/2018 10:30 AM]
285
03/30/2018
MOTION, to file supplemental brief, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 03/30/2018 by CM/ECF. [2269106] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 03/30/2018 05:26 PM]
286
04/06/2018
OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [285], on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 04/06/2018 by CM/ECF. [2273809] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 04/06/2018 02:42 PM]
289
04/11/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for leave to file a sur reply brief [285] filed by Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, by DAL, FILED. [2276312][289] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 04/11/2018 09:04 AM]
290
04/25/2018
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF.[2288428] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 04/25/2018 04:28 PM]
291
04/30/2018
MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher in 17-1989, FILED. Service date 04/30/2018 by CM/ECF. [2291528] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 04/30/2018 04:19 PM]
293
05/07/2018
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Sur-Reply Brief, [290], on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-2413, FILED.[2296385] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 05/07/2018 10:55 AM]
295
05/07/2018
SUR-REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 05/07/2018 by CM/ECF.[2296484] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 05/07/2018 11:33 AM]
296
05/10/2018
CURED DEFECTIVE Sur-Reply Brief, [295], on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc in 17-1989, FILED.[2299788] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 05/10/2018 12:16 PM]
301
05/15/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for leave to submit a sur-rebuttal brief of 2,000 words [291] filed by Appellant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab YieldPlus Fund, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust and The Charles Schwab Corporation in 17-1569, by SLC, FILED. [2303371][301] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 05/15/2018 03:06 PM]
302
05/17/2018
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, joining in on appellees sur-reply brief filed 05/07/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2305237] [17-2381] [Entered: 05/17/2018 12:00 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.