Salix Capital US Inc. v. Banc of America Securities LLC
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-02351 (ca2)

LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2122278] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/12/2017 11:21 AM]

Case 17-2351, Document 113, 09/12/2017, 2122278, Page1 of 2 MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP 28 LIBERTY STREET LOS ANGELES 213-892-4000 FAX: 213-629-5063 NEW YORK, N. Y. 10005-1413 BEIJING 8610-5969-2700 FAX: 8610-5969-2707 212-530-5000 WASHINGTON, D. C. 202-835-7500 AX; 202-835-7586 HONG KONG 852-2971-4888 FAX: 852-2840-0792 FAX: 212-530-5219 LONDON 44-20-7615-3000 AX: 44-20-7615-3100 SEOUI 822-6137-2600 FAX: 822-6137-2626 Robert C. Hora Pirl DIRECT DIAL NUMBER 2-530-5170 E-MA IL: Th lbank FRANKFURT 49-69-71914 300 FAX: 49-69-71914-3500 SINGAPORE 65-6428-2400 FAX: 65-6428-2500 MUNIC 49-89-25559-360 FAX 9-89-25559-3700 September 12, 2017 TOKYO 813-5410-2801 FAX: 813-540 2891 SAO PAULO 3927-7700 FAX 55. 3927-7777 VIA ECF Ms Catherine O' Hagan Wolfe Clerk of the Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U. S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, New York 10007 Re: In re LIBOR-Based Financial (Schwab Short-Term Bond Fund et al. v. Lloyds Banking Group plc et al), No. 17-1569 (lead case in consolidated appeals) Salix Capital US Inc. v. Banc of America Securities, LLC, et al, Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381 (the " Salix Appeals Dear Ms Wolfe: We represent Defendant Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B. A. (n/k/a Cooperatieve Rabobank U. A.) (Rabobank "), Defendant-Appellee in the appeals consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569. I write with respect to the above-referenced Salix Appeals, which are among a number of appeals consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569 by order dated August 24, 2017 (ECF No. 137, to request that the Court correct a clerical error in the docket of the Salix Appeals only. Although Rabobank is a Defendant-Appellee in the lead appeal and in certain other appeals consolidated with it under Docket No. 17-1569, Rabobank is not a party to the Salix Appeals. It should therefore be deleted from the list of Defendants-Appellees on the dockets of Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381 I also request that the Clerk strike or remove the appearances that our office inadvertently entered on the dockets of the Salix Appeals on behalf of Rabobank (found at ECF Nos. 33, 34, 35, and 97 on docket No. 17-2351 and at ECF Nos. 34, 35, and 36 on docket No. 17-2381). Case 17-2351, Document 113, 09/12/2017, 2122278, Page 2 of 2 Ms Catherine O' Hagan Wolfe Clerk of the Court September 12, 2017 Page 2 Respectfully submitted, Rohrt C. Hora loo Robert C. Hora cc: All Counsel of Record (Via ECF)

LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2127390] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/18/2017 05:18 PM]

Case 17-2351, Document 114, 09/18/2017, 2127390, Page1 of 2 September 18, 2017 David Sapir Lesser +1 212 230 8851 (t) VIA ECF +1 212 230 8888 (f) david.lesser@wilmerhale.com Ms. Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: In re LIBOR-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation, No. 17-1569; Salix Capital US Inc. v. Banc of America Securities, LLC, et al., Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381 (the "Salix Appeals") Dear Ms. Wolfe: This firm represents The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, a Defendant-Appellee in the appeals consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569. We write to correct certain errors in the dockets of the Salix Appeals (Dkt. 17-2381; Dkt. 17-2351), which are among the appeals consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569 by this Court’s Order dated August 24, 2017 (ECF No. 137), including the erroneous listing of RBS Securities Inc., Citizens Bank, N.A., and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group as parties to the Salix appeals. We initially raised these issues in letters to the Court dated August 16, 2017 (ECF No. 27-2, Dkt. 17-2381; ECF No. 30-2, Dkt. 17-2351). On September 5, 2017, however, we received notice informing us that RBS Securities Inc., Citizens Bank, N.A., and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group had failed to file appearances (ECF No. 97, Dkt. 17-2381; ECF No. 103; Dkt. 17-2351). Although The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc is a Defendant-Appellee in the lead appeal and certain other appeals consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569, it is not a party to the Salix Appeals. Therefore, it should not be listed as a Defendant-Appellee on Docket Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381. RBS Securities Inc. is not a party to any appeal consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569 and should not be listed as a Defendant-Appellee on Docket No. 17-2351. Citizens Bank, N.A is not a party to any appeal consolidated under Docket No. 17-1569 and should not be listed as a Defendant-Appellee on Docket No. 17-2381. See Salix Capital US Inc. v. Banc of America Securities LLC, et al., 1:13-cv-04018 (NRB), Dkt. No. 69 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 8, 2014); In re LIBOR-Based Fin. Instruments Antitrust Litig., 1:11-md-02262 (NRB), Dkt. No. 668 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 6, 2014). Accordingly, we respectfully request that the Clerk (1) remove The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc from the list of Defendants-Appellees on Docket Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381; (2) remove RBS Securities Inc. from the list of Defendants-Appellees on Docket No. 17-2351; Case 17-2351, Document 114, 09/18/2017, 2127390, Page2 of 2 Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe VIA ECF Page 2 and (3) remove Citizens Bank N.A. from the list of Defendants-Appellees on Docket No. 17-2381. As these entities should not be listed as Defendants-Appellees on the dockets referenced, we further respectfully request that the Clerk remove Robert G. Houck as counsel for The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc on Docket Nos. 17-2351 and 17-2381, Joel Kurtzberg as counsel for RBS Securities, Inc. and Citizens Bank, N.A. on Docket No. 17-2351, and Alan Schoenfeld as counsel for Citizens Bank, N.A. on Docket No. 17-2381. Respectfully submitted,/s/David Sapir Lesser David Lesser

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. [2091973] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:28 PM]
2
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF A PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2091986] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:31 PM]
3
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF A PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2091992] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:33 PM]
4
07/31/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., district court receipt # 0208-13956257, FILED.[2091995] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:35 PM]
7
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2092004] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/02/2017 02:38 PM]
12
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099088] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:35 PM]
13
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099094] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:37 PM]
17
08/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100036] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/14/2017 02:34 PM]
18
08/14/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100152] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:23 PM]
20
08/15/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101208] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:35 PM]
21
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101230] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:46 PM]
22
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101298] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:20 PM]
23
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2351, [21], ADDED.[2101325] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:30 PM]
24
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101590] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/15/2017 06:56 PM]
25
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [24], in place of attorney Elai Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[2101680] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:49 AM]
27
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101870] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:29 AM]
29
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [22], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd, FILED.[2102228] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 01:38 PM]
30
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102449] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:19 PM]
31
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Banc of America Securities, LLC, Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102516] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:50 PM]
32
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102573] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:50 PM]
33
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102585] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:10 PM]
34
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102586] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:17 PM]
35
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102587] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:20 PM]
36
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, request that Norinchukin be removed from the caption, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102588] [17-2351]--[Edited 08/17/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:27 PM]
37
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee British Bankers' Association and BBA Libor, Ltd., request that British Bankers' Association and BBA Libor be removed as Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102601] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:43 PM]
38
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102617] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:04 PM]
39
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102631] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:19 PM]
40
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102633] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:23 PM]
41
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102636] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:46 PM]
42
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada and RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102642] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:07 PM]
44
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and The Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102805] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:50 AM]
46
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2351, [34], ADDED.[2103000] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:13 AM]
47
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2351, [35], ADDED.[2103021] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:20 AM]
49
08/17/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, withdrawl as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103052] [17-2351]--[Edited 08/18/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:34 AM]
53
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103366] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:38 PM]
55
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2351, [40], ADDED.[2103511] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:40 PM]
57
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento [44], in place of attorney Edwin R. DeYoung, SUBSTITUTED.[2104018] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:10 AM]
58
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104512] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:02 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104517] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:04 PM]
60
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104529] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:08 PM]
61
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104553] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:20 PM]
62
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104573] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:31 PM]
63
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104592] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:40 PM]
64
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert G. Houck, for Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, TERMINATED.[2104622] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:52 PM]
65
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104652] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:01 PM]
66
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104700] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:25 PM]
67
08/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [53], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2104840] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:29 PM]
68
08/18/2017
LETTER, on behalf of -- Banc of America Securities, LLC, Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., notifying the court Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., and Banc of America Securities are not parties to this appeal and request that Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP be removed as counsel for certain entities, RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104891] [17-2351]--[Edited 08/21/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:57 PM]
69
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2351, [58], ADDED.[2105041] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/20/2017 08:58 AM]
70
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2351, [60], ADDED.[2105045] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:18 AM]
71
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Steig David Olson for Appellant Salix Capital US Inc., in case 17-2351, [61], ADDED.[2105051] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:50 AM]
72
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2351, [62], ADDED.[2105055] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/20/2017 11:53 AM]
73
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2351, [63], ADDED.[2105063] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/20/2017 04:33 PM]
74
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Wise for Portigon AG, Arthur Burke for WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, Arthur Burke for Royal Bank of Canada and Arthur Burke for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., TERMINATED.[2105825] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/21/2017 12:40 PM]
75
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2351, [66], ADDED.[2105845] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/21/2017 12:47 PM]
76
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellees Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2351, [65], ADDED.[2105922] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:19 PM]
77
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith, [42], in place of attorney Brian J. Poronsky, SUBSTITUTED.[2106185] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:40 PM]
78
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106472] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/21/2017 11:41 PM]
79
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107451] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:23 PM]
80
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107887] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:37 PM]
81
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Paparella, [78], in place of attorney David Hugh Stern, SUBSTITUTED.[2108481] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/23/2017 12:59 PM]
82
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108938] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:34 PM]
90
08/24/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [2109192-2], [2109246-2], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada in 17-2351, FILED.[2109679] [17-2413, 17-2351] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:05 PM]
91
08/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2351, [82], ADDED.[2109767] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:52 PM]
92
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2360, [2108931-2], ADDED.[2109904] [17-2360, 17-2351] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:06 AM]
94
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
95
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113039] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:46 PM]
96
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [95], ADDED.[2113695] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:28 PM]
97
08/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2113698] [17-2351] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:31 PM]
98
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [94], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
99
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
100
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
101
09/06/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, these entities are not parties to the Salix Appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 09/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[2117726] [17-2351]--[Edited 09/06/2017 by TT] [Entered: 09/06/2017 11:34 AM]
102
09/06/2017
NOTICE, to Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc and Societe Generale, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2117731] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/06/2017 11:36 AM]
103
09/07/2017
NOTICE, to Appellees Citizens Bank N.A., RBS Securities Inc. and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2118574] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:08 AM]
104
09/07/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [78], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2118602] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:14 AM]
106
09/07/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2118638] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:31 AM]
108
09/08/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2120060] [17-2347, 17-1569, 17-2351] [Entered: 09/08/2017 11:36 AM]
109
09/08/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-1569 Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2376, [2119926-2], ADDED.[2120595] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-2351] [Entered: 09/08/2017 04:08 PM]
110
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
111
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [2121293-2], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
112
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
113
09/12/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2122278] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/12/2017 11:21 AM]
114
09/18/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2127390] [17-2351] [Entered: 09/18/2017 05:18 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.