Sallison v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00051 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
35
04/18/2018
ORDER denying 23 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint, at docket 25, is stricken. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/18/18.
36
07/10/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
37
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
38
09/13/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
39
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
40
10/17/2018
Notice of Settlement
41
10/18/2018
Order
42
11/07/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
43
11/08/2018
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.