Samantha J. Potter
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00058 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/25/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/25/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
02/25/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/25/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
02/25/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
02/26/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/26/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
02/26/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
02/27/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
03/07/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/11/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
03/21/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/15/2019
Change of Address
04/15/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.