Sambois et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00254 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
10/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
13
10/19/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
14
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
15
12/19/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
16
12/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
17
01/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
18
02/01/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines
19
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.