Samuel Hudson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01880 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
01/28/2019
Order Rescheduling Hearing
48
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
02/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.