Samuel j Hibbs and Penny l. Hibbs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2010-bk-25749 (azb)

Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). The mailing list of creditors if not uploaded when the petition was filed, must be uploaded no later than seven days from the date of the filing of the petition. Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 09/7/2010, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 08/30/2010, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 08/30/2010, filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Samuel J Hibbs, Penny L. Hibbs

Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 6 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 7 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 8 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 9 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 10 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 11 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 12 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 13 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 14 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 15 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 16 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 17 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 18 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 19 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 20 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 21 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 22 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 23 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 24 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 25 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 26 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 27 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 28 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 29 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 30 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 31 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 32 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 33 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 34 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 35 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 36 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 37 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 38 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 39 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 40 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 41 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 42 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 43 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 44 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 45 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 46 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 47 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 48 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 49 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 50 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 51 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 52 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 53 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 54 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 55 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 56 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 57 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 58 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 59 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 60 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 61 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 62 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 63 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 64 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 65 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 66 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 67 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 68 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 69 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 70 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 71 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 72 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 73 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 74 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 75 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 76 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 77 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 78 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 79 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 80 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 81 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 82 of 83 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 1 Filed 08/16/10 Entered 08/16/10 11:19:10 Desc Main Document Page 83 of 83

Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/09/2016 Subject: TRUSTEE MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING AND U.S. TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING FILED BY LARRY L. WATSON OF OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE. (vCal Hearing ID (1334404)). (related document(s) {{87}})

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA Minute Entry Hearing Information: Debtor: SAMUEL J & PENNY L. HIBBS Case Number: 2:10-BK-25749-DPC Chapter: 7 Date/Time/Room: MONDAY, MAY 09, 2016 10:00 AM 6TH FLOOR #603 Bankruptcy Judge: DANIEL P. COLLINS Courtroom Clerk: Reporter/ECR: N/A 0.00 Matter: TRUSTEE MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING AND U.S. TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING FILED BY LARRY L. WATSON OF OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE R/M #: 87/0 VACATED: Motion to Vacate NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 9, 2016 filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Appearances: NONE Proceedings: 1.00 VACATED: Motion to Vacate NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 9, 2016 filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 91 Filed 05/09/16 Entered 05/09/16 08:21:43 Desc Page 1 of 1 05/09/2016 8:21:29AM Main Document Page 1 of 1

Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.

UST-32, 3-03 DAVID A. BIRDSELL Bankruptcy Trustee 216 N CENTER ST MESA, AZ 85201 (480) 644-1080 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA In re:) CHAPTER 7) HIBBS, SAMUEL J) CASE NO. 10-bk-25749-DPC HIBBS, PENNY L.))) APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR Debtor(s)) PAYMENT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS) U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT DAVID A. BIRDSELL, Trustee, reports that the following dividend checks have been issued and not presented for payment, and returned by USPS as undeliverable. CHECK NO. DATE DEBTOR’S NAME AND ADDRESS AMOUNT ISSUED 1001 2/8/17 SAMUEL J HIBBS and $1,813.47 PENNY L. HIBBS 12637 W. CAMBRIDGE AVE. AVONDALE, AZ 85323 February 20, 2017/s/David A. Birdsell DATE David A. Birdsell, Trustee Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 92 Filed 02/20/17 Entered 02/20/17 12:53:33 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Objection Debtors' Objection to Trustee's Application for Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds to the Bankruptcy Court filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs (related document(s) {{92}} Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).

1 Jeffery R. Finley, AZ Bar No. 009683 SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL 2 KONECKY WOTKYNS LLP 8501 North Scottsdale Road, Suite 270 3 Scottsdale, Arizona 85253 4 Telephone: (480) 315-3840 Facsimile: (866) 505-8036 5 jfinley@schneiderwallace.com 6 7 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 8 9 CHAPTER 7 In re: 10 Case No. 10-bk-25749-DPC HIBBS, SAMUEL J. 11 HIBBS, PENNY L. DEBTORS’ OBJECTION TO TRUSTEE’S APPLICATION FOR 12 Debtor(s) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS TO THE 13 BANKRUPTCY COURT 14 15 Samuel and Penny Hibbs, Debtors, through undersigned counsel, hereby Object to 16 the Trustee’s application for order for payment of unclaimed funds to the Bankruptcy 17 Court. The debtors object for the simple reason that the funds are not "unclaimed" and 18 19 Debtors hereby provide notice that their address is 2116 North 196th Avenue, Buckeye 20 Avenue, Buckeye Arizona 85396. Furthermore, Debtors are represented by undersigned 21 counsel whose name and address appear in the State Bar’s directory, yet no attempt was 22 made to contact counsel. Thus, it is respectfully requested that the Trustee be directed to 23 24 forward said funds to: 25 Samuel J. Hibbs and Penny L. Hibbs c/o Jeffrey R. Finley, Attorney 26 SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL 27 KONECKY WOTKYNS LLP 8501 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 270 28 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 94 Filed 02/21/17 Entered 02/21/17 12:54:05 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 1 Scottsdale, Arizona 85253 2 A proposed Order has been submitted for the Court’s convenience. 3 Date: February 21, 2017 Respectfully submitted, 4 5/s/Jeffrey R. Finley Jeffrey R. Finley, AZ Bar No. 009683 6 SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL KONECKY WOTKYNS LLP 7 8501 North Scottsdale Road, Suite 270 Scottsdale, Arizona 85253 8 Telephone: (480) 315-3840 9 Facsimile: (866) 505-8036 jfinley@schneiderwallace.com 10 11 12 13 Certificate of Service 14 I hereby certify that on this 21st day of February, 2017, I electronically transmitted 15 the foregoing document to the Office of the Clerk of the United States Bankruptcy Court, 16 17 District of Arizona, using the CM/ECF System for filing, with a transmittal of a Notice of 18 Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 19 20 By:/s/Kelle J. Winter 21 Kelle J. Winter 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-2-Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 94 Filed 02/21/17 Entered 02/21/17 12:54:05 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs (related document(s) {{94}} Objection).

1 Jeffery R. Finley, AZ Bar No. 009683 SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL 2 KONECKY WOTKYNS LLP 8501 North Scottsdale Road, Suite 270 3 Scottsdale, Arizona 85253 4 Telephone: (480) 315-3840 Facsimile: (866) 505-8036 5 jfinley@schneiderwallace.com 6 7 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 8 9 CHAPTER 7 In re: 10 Case No. 10-bk-25749-DPC HIBBS, SAMUEL J. 11 HIBBS, PENNY L. [PROPOSED] ORDER 12 Debtor(s) 13 14 Upon Debtors Samuel J. Hibbs and Penny L. Hibbs’ ("Debtors") objection to the 15 Trustee’s application for order for payment of unclaimed funds to the Bankruptcy Court, 16 and good cause appearing, 17 18 IT IS ORDERED that the Trustee pay over the amount of $1.813.47 to Debtor’s 19 counsel, c/o Jeffrey R. Finley, Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP, 8501 20 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 270, Scottsdale, Arizona 85253. 21 Dated: __________________ 22 _______________________________ 23 The Honorable Daniel P. Collins 24 United States Bankruptcy Court 25 26 27 28 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Doc 95 Filed 02/21/17 Entered 02/21/17 12:59:39 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Trustee's Report of Final Account and Distribution Report and Application to be Discharged. (Dickman, Lori Ann)

1A 101-7-TDR /2010 /2009 2ems Inc. UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT DISTRICT OF ARIZONA PHOENIX DIVISION In Re: § § SAMUEL J HIBBS § Case No. 2:10-bk-25749-DPC PENNY L. HIBBS § § Debtors § CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE'S FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISTRIBUTION REPORT CERTIFICATION THAT THE ESTATE HAS BEEN FULLY ADMINISTERED AND APPLICATION TO BE DISCHARGED (TDR) DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE, chapter 7 trustee, submits this Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application to be Discharged. 1) All funds on hand have been distributed in accordance with the Trustee's Final Report and, if applicable, any order of the Court modifying the Final Report. The case is fully administered and all assets and funds which have come under the trustee's control in this case have been properly accounted for as provided by law. The trustee hereby requests to be discharged from further duties as a trustee. 2) A summary of assets abandoned, assets exempt, total distributions to claimants, claims discharged without payment, and expenses of administration is provided below: Assets Abandoned: 0.00 Assets Exempt: 8,430.00 (Without deducting any secured claims) Total Distributions to Claimants: 9,791.82 Claims Discharged Without Payment: 1,583,549.93 Total Expenses of Administration: 14,403.21 3) Total gross receipts of $ 26,008.50 (see Exhibit 1), minus funds paid to the debtor and third parties of $ 1,813.47 (see Exhibit 2), yielded net receipts of $ 24,195.03 from the liquidation of the property of the estate, which was distributed as follows: Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 1) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 1 of 22 CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS SCHEDULED ASSERTED ALLOWED PAID SECURED CLAIMS (from Exhibit 3) $ 196,658.81 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 PRIORITY CLAIMS: CHAPTER 7 ADMIN. FEES AND CHARGES (from Exhibit 4) NA 14,403.21 14,403.21 14,403.21 PRIOR CHAPTER ADMIN. FEES AND CHARGES (from Exhibit 5) NA NA NA NA PRIORITY UNSECURED CLAIMS (from Exhibit 6) 8,348.81 0.00 0.00 0.00 GENERAL UNSECURED CLAIMS (from Exhibit 7) 1,402,703.44 297,175.93 297,175.93 9,791.82 TOTAL DISBURSEMENTS $ 1,607,711.06 $ 311,579.14 $ 311,579.14 $ 24,195.03 4) This case was originally filed under chapter 7 on 08/14/2010. The case was pending for 98 months. 5) All estate bank statements, deposit slips, and canceled checks have been submitted to the United States Trustee. 6) An individual estate property record and report showing the final accounting of the assets of the estate is attached as Exhibit 8. The cash receipts and disbursements records for each estate bank account, showing the final accounting of the receipts and disbursements of estate funds is attached as Exhibit 9. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify, under penalty of perjury, that the foregoing report is true and correct. Dated: 08/28/2018 By:/s/DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Trustee STATEMENT: This Uniform Form is associated with an open bankruptcy case, therefore, Paperwork Reduction Act exemption 5 C.F.R. § 1320.4(a)(2) applies. Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 2) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 2 of 22 EXHIBITS TO FINAL ACCOUNT EXHIBIT 1 – GROSS RECEIPTS DESCRIPTION UNIFORM $ AMOUNT TRAN. CODE1 RECEIVED 2010 TAX REFUNDS (ESTATE'S SHARE) 1224-000 2,004.00 JUDGMENT OBTAIN VS DEBTORS FOR UNACCOUNTED CASH 1249-000 24,004.50 TOTAL GROSS RECEIPTS $ 26,008.50 1 The Uniform Transaction Code is an accounting code assigned by the trustee for statistical reporting purposes. EXHIBIT 2 – FUNDS PAID TO DEBTOR & THIRD PARTIES PAYEE DESCRIPTION UNIFORM $ AMOUNT TRAN. CODE PAID SAMUEL J HIBBS and PENNY L. Non-Estate Funds Paid to Third HIBBS Parties 8500-002 1,813.47 TOTAL FUNDS PAID TO DEBTOR & $ 1,813.47 THIRD PARTIES EXHIBIT 3 – SECURED CLAIMS UNIFORM CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. SCHEDULED CLAIMS PAID ASSERTED ALLOWED CODE (from Form 6D) Chrysler Financial 6,478.68 NA NA 0.00 CitiMortgage, Inc. 128,360.01 NA NA 0.00 Delage Landen 11,091.36 NA NA 0.00 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 3) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 3 of 22 UNIFORM CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. SCHEDULED CLAIMS PAID ASSERTED ALLOWED CODE (from Form 6D) Dolphon Capital Corp. 4,514.51 NA NA 0.00 IBM Pro Mat Inc 7,581.05 NA NA 0.00 Wells Fargo Bank 38,633.20 NA NA 0.00 TOTAL SECURED CLAIMS $ 196,658.81 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 EXHIBIT 4 – CHAPTER 7 ADMINISTRATIVE FEES and CHARGES UNIFORM CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS PAYEE TRAN. CLAIMS PAID SCHEDULED ASSERTED ALLOWED CODE DAVID A. BIRDSELL 2100-000 NA 3,169.50 3,169.50 3,169.50 DAVID A. BIRDSELL 2200-000 NA 219.15 219.15 219.15 Bank of Kansas City 2600-000 NA 49.67 49.67 49.67 Integrity Bank 2600-000 NA 459.15 459.15 459.15 The Bank of New York Mellon 2600-000 NA 50.00 50.00 50.00 ADAM NACH 3210-000 NA 4,484.00 4,484.00 4,484.00 LANE & NACH 3210-000 NA 5,753.50 5,753.50 5,753.50 ADAM NACH 3220-000 NA 89.82 89.82 89.82 LANE & NACH 3220-000 NA 128.42 128.42 128.42 TOTAL CHAPTER 7 ADMIN. FEES $ NA $ 14,403.21 $ 14,403.21 $ 14,403.21 AND CHARGES Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 4) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 4 of 22 EXHIBIT 5 – PRIOR CHAPTER ADMINISTRATIVE FEES and CHARGES UNIFORM CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS PAYEE TRAN. CLAIMS PAID SCHEDULED ASSERTED ALLOWED CODE NA: NA NA NA NA NA NA TOTAL PRIOR CHAPTER ADMIN. $ NA $ NA $ NA $ NA FEES AND CHARGES EXHIBIT 6 – PRIORITY UNSECURED CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS UNIFORM SCHEDULED ASSERTED CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. CLAIMS PAID (from Form (from Proofs of ALLOWED CODE 6E) Claim) AZ Dept of Revenue 4,755.96 NA NA 0.00 City Treasurer 3,592.85 NA NA 0.00 TOTAL PRIORITY UNSECURED $ 8,348.81 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 $ 0.00 CLAIMS EXHIBIT 7 – GENERAL UNSECURED CLAIMS CLAIMS CLAIMS UNIFORM SCHEDULED ASSERTED CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. CLAIMS PAID (from Form (from Proofs of ALLOWED CODE 6F) Claim) 105th & Buckeye, LLC 215,198.30 NA NA 0.00 A Sure Fleet 3,330.43 NA NA 0.00 Arizona Portland Cement 27,278.69 NA NA 0.00 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 5) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 5 of 22 CLAIMS CLAIMS UNIFORM SCHEDULED ASSERTED CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. CLAIMS PAID (from Form (from Proofs of ALLOWED CODE 6F) Claim) AZ Neurological Institute 226.70 NA NA 0.00 Bank of America 9,423.82 NA NA 0.00 Bankcard Services 78.02 NA NA 0.00 Bomat, Inc. 469,150.76 NA NA 0.00 CBS Outdoor 1,961.10 NA NA 0.00 Chase Cards 10,668.54 NA NA 0.00 Chase Cards 6,233.50 NA NA 0.00 Citi Cards 22,834.18 NA NA 0.00 COX Communications 160.32 NA NA 0.00 Custom Building Products 40,494.90 NA NA 0.00 Dallas Specialty 12,888.89 NA NA 0.00 DEX Media West LLC 911.31 NA NA 0.00 Dietrich Metal Framing 7,112.20 NA NA 0.00 Georgia Pacific Corp 5,152.00 NA NA 0.00 H.B. Fuller Co. 6,499.31 NA NA 0.00 IMS McDowell W Int Med. 10.00 NA NA 0.00 IPN Arizona 364.75 NA NA 0.00 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 6) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 6 of 22 CLAIMS CLAIMS UNIFORM SCHEDULED ASSERTED CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. CLAIMS PAID (from Form (from Proofs of ALLOWED CODE 6F) Claim) John C. Lincoln Hospital 100.00 NA NA 0.00 LOOP 101 ER Physicians 777.00 NA NA 0.00 Mapei Corporation 84,846.30 NA NA 0.00 Old Navy Visa 168.00 NA NA 0.00 Paragon Concrete Products 1,000.00 NA NA 0.00 Pasadena Financial Group 22,872.97 NA NA 0.00 Protecto Wrap 24,761.80 NA NA 0.00 Rick Beren 7,625.00 NA NA 0.00 Southwest Gas Corp 32.12 NA NA 0.00 Southwest Trading Tile Co 23,370.12 NA NA 0.00 Superlite Block 22,602.79 NA NA 0.00 Superlite Block 52,730.78 NA NA 0.00 Surtape 10,000.00 NA NA 0.00 West Valley Hospital 193.60 NA NA 0.00 West Valley Hospital 100.00 NA NA 0.00 10 Advance Me, Inc. 7100-000 51,596.00 40,541.96 40,541.96 1,335.84 2 Alpha Professional Tools 7100-000 3,991.28 3,785.97 3,785.97 124.75 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 7) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 7 of 22 CLAIMS CLAIMS UNIFORM SCHEDULED ASSERTED CLAIMS CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT TRAN. CLAIMS PAID (from Form (from Proofs of ALLOWED CODE 6F) Claim) 9 American Express Bank, FSB 7100-000 53,319.60 47,214.51 47,214.51 1,555.70 AMERICAN EXPRESS 8 CENTURION BANK 7100-000 157,628.99 149,583.50 149,583.50 4,928.71 ARIZONA STATE CREDIT 6 UNION 7100-000 15,229.18 15,229.18 15,229.18 501.79 Capital One Bank (USA), 5 N.A. 7100-000 17,517.40 27,196.54 27,196.54 896.11 3 FIA Card Services, N.A. 7100-000 9,423.82 9,423.82 9,423.82 310.51 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. AS 11 AGENT FOR 7100-000 NA 371.45 371.45 12.24 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. AS 12 AGENT FOR 7100-000 NA 696.43 696.43 22.96 1 Navistar Financial Corp 7100-000 2,838.97 2,838.97 2,838.97 93.54 7 ABRAZO HEALTHCARE 7100-001 NA 293.60 293.60 9.67 TOTAL GENERAL UNSECURED $ 1,402,703.44 $ 297,175.93 $ 297,175.93 $ 9,791.82 CLAIMS Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 8) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 8 of 22 Page: 1 FORM 1 INDIVIDUAL ESTATE PROPERTY RECORD AND REPORT ASSET CASES Exhibit 8 Case No: 10-25749 DPC Judge: Daniel P. Collins Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Date Filed (f) or Converted (c): 08/14/2010 (f) PENNY L. HIBBS 341(a) Meeting Date: 09/23/2010 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Claims Bar Date: 05/30/2012 1 2 3 4 5 6 Asset Description Petition/ Est Net Value Property Formally Sale/Funds Asset Fully (Scheduled and Unscheduled (u) Property) Unscheduled (Value Determined by Abandoned Received by Administered (FA)/ Values Trustee, Less Liens, OA=554(a) the Estate Gross Value of Remaining Exemptions, Assets and Other Costs) 1. 12637 W CAMBRIDGE AVE AVONDALE AZ 0.00 0.00 OA 0.00 FA ABANDONMENT FILED 2. CASH 230.00 0.00 0.00 FA 3. CASH IN BANK 500.00 0.00 0.00 FA 4. HOUSEHOLDS 1,500.00 0.00 0.00 FA 5. BOOKS ETC 450.00 0.00 0.00 FA 6. APPAREL 600.00 0.00 0.00 FA 7. CAMERA 200.00 0.00 0.00 FA 8. LIFE INSURANCE 600.00 0.00 0.00 FA 9. AMERICAN FUND 4,000.00 0.00 0.00 FA 10. OFFICE EQUIPMENT & FURN. 200.00 0.00 0.00 FA 11. PETS 150.00 0.00 0.00 FA 12. 2010 TAX REFUNDS (ESTATE'S SHARE) (u) 0.00 2,004.00 2,004.00 FA 13. JUDGMENT OBTAIN VS DEBTORS FOR UNACCOUNTED 0.00 21,679.46 24,004.50 FA CASH (u) INT. Interest Earned 0.00 N/A 0.00 FA Gross Value of Remaining Assets TOTALS (Excluding Unknown Values) $8,430.00 $23,683.46 $26,008.50 $0.00 (Total Dollar Amount in Column 6) Major activities affecting case closing which are not reflected above, and matters pending, date of hearing or sale, and other action: TRUSTEE HAS FILED HIS FINAL REPORT (01/25/18) WITH THE UST AND IS NOW PENDING THEIR APPROVAL Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 9) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 9 of 22 Page: 2 Initial Projected Date of Final Report (TFR): 12/31/2012 Current Projected Date of Final Report (TFR): 01/25/2018 Exhibit 8 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 10) Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 Desc Page 10 of 22 Page: 1 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: The Bank of New York Mellon PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX8366 Checking Account Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 02/21/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $180.79 $180.79 02/29/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $228.35 $409.14 02/29/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $346.10 $755.24 03/05/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $228.28 $983.52 03/13/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $201.88 $1,185.40 03/20/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $224.99 $1,410.39 03/27/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $201.10 $1,611.49 03/30/12 The Bank of New York Mellon Bank and Technology Services 2600-000 $25.00 $1,586.49 Fee 04/11/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $190.05 $1,776.54 04/13/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $199.49 $1,976.03 04/23/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $184.61 $2,160.64 04/30/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $168.98 $2,329.62 04/30/12 The Bank of New York Mellon Bank and Technology Services 2600-000 $25.00 $2,304.62 Fee 05/10/12 Integrity Bank Transfer Funds 9999-000 $2,304.62 $0.00 COLUMN TOTALS $2,354.62 $2,354.62 Less: Bank Transfers/CD's $0.00 $2,304.62 Subtotal $2,354.62 $50.00 Less: Payments to Debtors $0.00 $0.00 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $2,354.62Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $2,354.62 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 11) Page 11 of 22 Page: 2 Net $2,354.62 $50.00 Exhibit 9 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50$0.00Desc $0.00 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 12) Page 12 of 22 Page: 3 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: BOK Financial PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX0471 Checking Account Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 09/17/14 Transfer from Acct XXXXXX5749 Transfer of funds 9999-000 $17,157.86 $17,157.86 09/30/14 Bank of Kansas City Bank Service Fee under 11 2600-000 $15.46 $17,142.40 U.S.C. 330(a)(1)(B), 503(b) (1), and 507(a)(2) 10/31/14 Bank of Kansas City Bank Service Fee under 11 2600-000 $34.21 $17,108.19 U.S.C. 330(a)(1)(B), 503(b) (1), and 507(a)(2) 04/24/15 12 SAMUEL HIBBS 2010 TAX REFUNDS 1224-000 $2,004.00 $19,112.19 06/11/15 13 ANTHONY CONNS ESTATE #12-25916 DEPOSITED TO WRONG 1249-000 $455.57 $19,567.76 ESTATE 02/08/17 1001 SAMUEL J HIBBS and PENNY L. HIBBS OVERPAYMENT OF 8500-000 $1,813.47 $17,754.29 12637 W. CAMBRIDGE AVE. GARNISHMENT AVONDALE, AZ 85323 02/20/17 1001 SAMUEL J HIBBS and PENNY L. HIBBS OVERPAYMENT OF 8500-000 ($1,813.47) $19,567.76 12637 W. CAMBRIDGE AVE. GARNISHMENT Reversal AVONDALE, AZ 85323 CHECK TO BE SENT TO UNCLAIMED FUNDS 02/20/17 1002 Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court Remit To Court 8500-001 $1,813.47 $17,754.29 US BANKRUPTCY COURT, CLERK 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE, SUITE 101 PHOENIX, AZ 85003-1706 03/20/17 1002 Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court Remit To Court Reversal 8500-000 ($1,813.47) $19,567.76 US BANKRUPTCY COURT, CLERK OBJECTION TO UNCLAIMED 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE, SUITE 101 FUNDS, DBTRS UPDATED PHOENIX, AZ 85003-1706 ADDRESS 03/20/17 1003 SAMUEL J HIBBS and PENNY L. HIBBS OVERPAYMENT OF 8500-002 $1,813.47 $17,754.29 2116 N. 196TH AVE. GARNISHMENT BUCKEYE, AZ. 85396 04/02/18 1004 DAVID A. BIRDSELL Distribution $3,388.65 $14,365.64 216 N. CENTER MESA, AZ. 85201 DAVID A. BIRDSELL Final distribution representing a ($3,169.50) 2100-000 payment of 100.00 % per court order. Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $19,617.43Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $5,251.79 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 13) Page 13 of 22 Page: 4 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: BOK Financial PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX0471 Checking Account Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) DAVID A. BIRDSELL Final distribution representing a ($219.15) 2200-000 payment of 100.00 % per court order. 04/02/18 1005 ADAM NACH Distribution $4,573.82 $9,791.82 C/O Lane & Nach, P.C. 2001 E Campbell Ave Ste 103 PHOENIX, AZ 85016-5573 ADAM NACH Final distribution representing a ($89.82) 3220-000 payment of 100.00 % per court order. ADAM NACH Final distribution representing a ($4,484.00) 3210-000 payment of 100.00 % per court order. 04/02/18 1006 Navistar Financial Corp Final distribution to claim 1 7100-000 $93.54 $9,698.28 425 N Martingale Rd 1800 representing a payment of 3.29 Schaumburg, Il 60173 % per court order. 04/02/18 1007 Alpha Professional Tools Final distribution to claim 2 7100-000 $124.75 $9,573.53 103 Bauer Drive representing a payment of 3.30 Oakland, Nj 07436 % per court order. 04/02/18 1008 FIA Card Services, N.A. Final distribution to claim 3 7100-000 $310.51 $9,263.02 PO Box 15102 representing a payment of 3.29 Wilmington, De 19886-5102 % per court order. 04/02/18 1009 Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Final distribution to claim 5 7100-000 $896.11 $8,366.91 PO Box 71083 representing a payment of 3.29 Charlotte, NC 28272-1083 % per court order. 04/02/18 1010 ARIZONA STATE CREDIT UNION Final distribution to claim 6 7100-000 $501.79 $7,865.12 2355 W PINNACLE PEAK RD representing a payment of 3.29 PHOENIX, AZ 85027 % per court order. 04/02/18 1011 ABRAZO HEALTHCARE Final distribution to claim 7 7100-000 $9.67 $7,855.45 PO BOX 81229 representing a payment of 3.29 PHOENIX, AZ 85069 % per court order. 04/02/18 1012 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION Final distribution to claim 8 7100-000 $4,928.71 $2,926.74 BANK representing a payment of 3.29 C/O Becket and Lee LLP % per court order. POB 3001 Malvern, PA 19355-0701 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50$0.00Desc $11,438.90 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 14) Page 14 of 22 Page: 5 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: BOK Financial PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX0471 Checking Account Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 04/02/18 1013 American Express Bank, FSB Final distribution to claim 9 7100-000 $1,555.70 $1,371.04 C O Becket And Lee Llp representing a payment of 3.29 POB 3001 % per court order. Malvern, Pa 19355-0701 04/02/18 1014 Advance Me, Inc. Final distribution to claim 10 7100-000 $1,335.84 $35.20 2015 Vaughn Road, Building 500 representing a payment of 3.29 Kennesaw, Ga 30144 % per court order. 04/02/18 1015 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Distribution $35.20 $0.00 AS AGENT FOR Midland Funding, LLC PO Box 2011 Warren, MI 48090 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Final distribution to claim 11 ($12.24) 7100-000 AS AGENT FOR representing a payment of 3.30 % per court order. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Final distribution to claim 12 ($22.96) 7100-000 AS AGENT FOR representing a payment of 3.30 % per court order. 05/19/18 1011 ABRAZO HEALTHCARE Final distribution to claim 7 7100-000 ($9.67) $9.67 PO BOX 81229 representing a payment of 3.29 PHOENIX, AZ 85069 % per court order. Reversal 08/13/18 1016 Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court Remit To Court 7100-001 $9.67 $0.00 US BANKRUPTCY COURT, CLERK 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE, SUITE 101 PHOENIX, AZ 85003-1706 COLUMN TOTALS $19,617.43 $19,617.43 Less: Bank Transfers/CD's $17,157.86 $0.00 Subtotal $2,459.57 $19,617.43 Less: Payments to Debtors $0.00 $0.00 Net $2,459.57 $19,617.43 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50$0.00Desc $2,926.74 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 15) Page 15 of 22 Page: 6 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: INTEGRITY BANK PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX5749 DDA Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 05/10/12 The Bank of New York Mellon Transfer Funds 9999-000 $2,304.62 $2,304.62 05/15/12 13 PETSMART GARNISHMENT GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $193.98 $2,498.60 05/15/12 13 PETSMART GARNISHMENT GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $228.78 $2,727.38 05/31/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $2.49 $2,724.89 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 06/04/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $209.92 $2,934.81 06/04/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $3,381.49 06/18/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $3,828.17 06/29/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $3.76 $3,824.41 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 07/09/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $4,271.09 07/27/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $4,717.77 07/27/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $5,164.45 07/31/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $4.33 $5,160.12 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 08/06/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $5,606.80 08/20/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $6,053.48 08/31/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $6.51 $6,046.97 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 09/19/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $6,493.65 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $6,510.74Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $17.09 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 16) Page 16 of 22 Page: 7 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: INTEGRITY BANK PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX5749 DDA Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 09/28/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $1.73 $6,491.92 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 09/28/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $7.10 $6,484.82 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 10/02/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $6,931.50 10/15/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $7,378.18 10/25/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 ($1.73) $7,379.91 10/31/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $7,826.59 10/31/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $8.13 $7,818.46 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 11/13/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $8,265.14 11/30/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $9.36 $8,255.78 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 12/03/12 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $446.68 $8,702.46 12/31/12 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $9.99 $8,692.47 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 01/31/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $10.18 $8,682.29 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 02/19/13 13 APD GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $447.77 $9,130.06 02/26/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $454.33 $9,584.39 02/28/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $10.15 $9,574.24 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $3,135.50Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $54.91 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 17) Page 17 of 22 Page: 8 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: INTEGRITY BANK PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX5749 DDA Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 03/05/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $447.77 $10,022.01 03/29/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $11.65 $10,010.36 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 04/01/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $1,394.95 $11,405.31 04/30/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $12.63 $11,392.68 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 05/31/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $12.38 $11,380.30 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 06/28/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $13.73 $11,366.57 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 07/27/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $11,822.14 07/31/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $14.25 $11,807.89 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 08/30/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $13.90 $11,793.99 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 09/16/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $12,249.56 09/16/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $12,705.13 09/30/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $15.85 $12,689.28 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 10/03/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $13,144.85 10/15/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $13,600.42 10/23/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $14,055.99 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $4,576.14Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $94.39 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 18) Page 18 of 22 Page: 9 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: INTEGRITY BANK PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX5749 DDA Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 10/31/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $18.02 $14,037.97 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 11/06/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $14,493.54 11/20/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $14,949.11 11/20/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $3,810.05 $18,759.16 11/29/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $18.75 $18,740.41 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 12/19/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $19,195.98 12/19/13 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $19,651.55 12/31/13 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $26.62 $19,624.93 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 01/06/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $20,080.50 01/21/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $20,536.07 01/31/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $27.61 $20,508.46 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 02/03/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $455.57 $20,964.03 Paso, TX 79972 02/13/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $458.68 $21,422.71 02/13/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $895.54 $22,318.25 02/26/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $458.68 $22,776.93 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $8,811.94Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $91.00 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 19) Page 19 of 22 Page: 10 FORM 2 ESTATE CASH RECEIPTS AND DISBURSEMENTS RECORD Case No: 10-25749 Trustee Name: DAVID A. BIRDSELL, TRUSTEE Exhibit 9 Case Name: SAMUEL J HIBBS Bank Name: INTEGRITY BANK PENNY L. HIBBS Account Number/CD#: XXXXXX5749 DDA Taxpayer ID No: XX-XXX3706 Blanket Bond (per case limit): $27,456,481.00 For Period Ending: 08/28/2018 Separate Bond (if applicable): 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 Transaction Date Check or Paid To / Received From Description of Transaction Uniform Tran. Deposits ($) Disbursements ($) Account/CD Balance Reference Code ($) 02/28/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $31.01 $22,745.92 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 03/10/14 13 ADP GARNISHMENT PROCEEDS 1249-000 $464.61 $23,210.53 03/31/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $30.49 $23,180.04 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 04/30/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $28.12 $23,151.92 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 05/30/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $26.79 $23,125.13 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 06/17/14 5002 LANE & NACH ATTORNEY'S EXPENSES 3220-000 $128.42 $22,996.71 2025 N. 3RD STREET, SUITE 157PHOENIX, AZ 850041425 06/17/14 5001 LANE & NACH ATTORNEY'S FEES 3210-000 $5,753.50 $17,243.21 2025 N. 3RD STREET, SUITE 157PHOENIX, AZ 850041425 06/30/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $26.22 $17,216.99 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 07/31/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $23.12 $17,193.87 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 08/29/14 Integrity Bank Bank Service Fee 2600-000 $23.59 $17,170.28 4040 Washington Ave.Houston, TX 77007 09/15/14 Integrity Bank BANK SERVICE FEE 2600-000 $12.42 $17,157.86 09/17/14 Transfer to Acct XXXXXX0471 Transfer of funds 9999-000 $17,157.86 $0.00 COLUMN TOTALS $23,498.93 $23,498.93 Less: Bank Transfers/CD's $2,304.62 $17,157.86 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 $464.61Desc Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50 $23,241.54 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 20) Page 20 of 22 Page: 11 Subtotal $21,194.31 $6,341.07 Less: Payments to Debtors $0.00 $0.00 Net $21,194.31 $6,341.07 Exhibit 9 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50$0.00Desc $0.00 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 21) Page 21 of 22 Page: 12 Exhibit 9 TOTAL OF ALL ACCOUNTS NET ACCOUNT NET DEPOSITS DISBURSEMENTS BALANCE XXXXXX0471 - Checking Account $2,459.57 $19,617.43 $0.00 XXXXXX5749 - DDA $21,194.31 $6,341.07 $0.00 XXXXXX8366 - Checking Account $2,354.62 $50.00 $0.00 $26,008.50 $26,008.50 $0.00 (Excludes account (Excludes payments Total Funds on Hand transfers) to debtors) Total Allocation Receipts: $0.00 Total Net Deposits: $26,008.50 Total Gross Receipts: $26,008.50 Case 2:10-bk-25749-DPC Page Subtotals: Doc 107 Filed 09/14/18 Entered 09/14/18 07:04:50$0.00Desc $0.00 UST Form 101-7-TDR (10/1/2010) (Page: 22) Page 22 of 22

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 560 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/16/2010
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). The mailing list of creditors if not uploaded when the petition was filed, must be uploaded no later than seven days from the date of the filing of the petition. Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 09/7/2010, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 08/30/2010, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 08/30/2010, filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Samuel J Hibbs, Penny L. Hibbs
08/16/2010
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:10-bk-25749) [other,volp7] (299.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12042025. Fee amount 299.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/16/2010
Credit Counseling Certificate of Samuel Hibbs filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs.
3
08/16/2010
Credit Counseling Certificate of Penny Hibbs filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs.
4
08/16/2010
Declaration of Attorney filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs.
5
08/16/2010
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 09/23/2010 at 09:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). (Admin,)
6
08/17/2010
Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) Complaints under Sections 727 or 523 due by 11/22/2010.
7
08/17/2010
Statement of Social Security Number Submitted (related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7))
8
08/17/2010
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 6 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint)
9
08/25/2010
Request for Notice filed by RAMESH SINGH of RECOVERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS CORP. on behalf of RECOVERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS CORPORATION.
10
09/23/2010
Financial Management Course Certificate of Sam J. Hibbs filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Samuel J Hibbs.
11
09/23/2010
Financial Management Course Certificate of Penny Hibbs filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of MASSEY & FINLEY, PC on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs.
12
09/22/2010
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
13
10/24/2010
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property Located at 12637 W. Cambridge ave. Avondale Az (liens exceed market value) filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
14
10/25/2010
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 13 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
15
11/29/2010
Chapter 7 Discharge.
16
11/29/2010
BNC Certificate of Notice - Discharge of Debtor (related document(s) 15 BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge)
17
08/09/2011
Application to Employ Attorney/Declaration of Attorney filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
18
08/09/2011
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Case Trustee to Employ Attorney filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 17 Application to Employ).
19
08/17/2011
ORDER Authorizing Case Trustee to Employ Attorney (Related Doc # 17) signed on 8/17/2011.
20
10/04/2011
Trustee Motion to Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
21
10/04/2011
Trustee Notice of Bar Date Notice of Trustee's Motion To Compel Turnover And Certifcate Of Service filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 20 Motion to Compel).
22
11/07/2011
Trustee Certificate of Service and No Objections Re: Motion to Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 20 Motion to Compel)
23
11/07/2011
Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Directing Turnover Of Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 20 Motion to Compel).
24
11/09/2011
ORDER Granting Motion to Compel Turnover of Property (Related Doc # 20) signed on 11/9/2011.
25
01/05/2012
Application for Writ of Garnishment for Earnings of Judgment Debtor filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
26
01/06/2012
Writ Issued via mail(related document(s) 25 Application for Writ)
27
01/06/2012
Writ Issued (related document(s) 25 Application for Writ)
28
01/10/2012
Certificate of Service filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 25 Application for Writ, 27 Writ Issued)
29
01/11/2012
Certificate of Service on Judgment Debtor filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 27 Writ Issued)
30
01/24/2012
Motion for Wage Order for Turnover of Nonexempt Earnings of Judgment Debtor and Continuing Lien on Earnings of Judgment Debtor filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 27 Writ Issued).
31
01/24/2012
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order for Turnover of Nonexempt Earnings of Judgment Debtor and Continuing Lien on Earnings of Judgment Debtor filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 30 Motion for Wage Order).
32
01/27/2012
ORDER For Turnover of Nonexempt Earning of Judgment Debtor and Continuing Lien on Earnings of Judgment Debtor (Related Doc # 30) signed on 1/27/2012.
33
02/29/2012
The Trustee reports that he or she now holds funds of this bankruptcy estate or expects to receive funds which should result in a dividend to creditors who were previously instructed not to file claims. The Trustee hereby requests that the Court fix the last date for filing proofs of claim and that notice be given to creditors. filed by DAVID 2 BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.(BIRDSELL, DAVID 2)
34
03/01/2012
Notice of Claims Bar Date. Proof of Claims due by 6/1/2012
35
03/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Claims Bar Date (related document(s) 34 BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date)
36
04/10/2012
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- First Quarter, 2012 filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
37
07/19/2012
Notice of Filing Quarterly Garnishment Report- Second Quarter filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
38
10/12/2012
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- Third Quarter, 2012 filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
01/18/2013
Case reassigned to Judge Daniel P. Collins due to the retirement of Judge Charles G. Case II. (admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/21/2013
Assignment/Transfer of Claim with Waiver of Notice Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: GE Capital Retail Bank (Claim No. 11) To Midland Funding LLC filed by RAMESH SINGH of RECOVERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS CORP. on behalf of Recovery Management Systems Corporation.
40
01/23/2013
Assignment/Transfer of Claim with Waiver of Notice Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: GE Capital Retail Bank (Claim No. 12) To Midland Funding LLC filed by RAMESH SINGH of RECOVERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS CORP. on behalf of Recovery Management Systems Corporation.
41
01/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 39 Assignment/Transfer of Claim with Waiver of Notice (or Notice of))
42
01/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 40 Assignment/Transfer of Claim with Waiver of Notice (or Notice of))
43
01/31/2013
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- Fourth Quarter, 2012 filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
44
04/12/2013
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- First Quarter 2013 filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
45
07/09/2013
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- Second Quarter 2013 filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
46
10/17/2013
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report- Third Quarter 2013 filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
47
01/15/2014
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report - 4th Quarter of 2013 filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
48
02/28/2014
Motion to Quash Writ of Garnishment/Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 27 Writ Issued).
49
02/28/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Quashing Writ of Garnishment filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 48 Motion to Quash).
50
02/28/2014
ORDER Granting Motion to Quash (Related Doc # 48) signed on 2/28/2014.
51
03/11/2014
Final Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 8/8/2011 to 3/5/2014, Fees:$5,735.50, Expenses: $128.42. filed by ADAM 1 NACH.
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Hibbs
1 Attachment
52
03/11/2014
Notice of Bar Date Notice of Final Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 51 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
53
03/11/2014
Certificate of Mailing Notice of Final Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 52 Notice of Bar Date)
54
03/17/2014
Amended Certificate of Mailing Notice of First Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 52 Notice of Bar Date)
55
04/14/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 51 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
56
04/14/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving First Application and Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 51 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
57
04/17/2014
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc # 51) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $5753.50, Expenses Awarded: $128.42 signed on 4/17/2014.
58
07/28/2014
Trustee Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Estate Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
59
07/28/2014
Notice of Bar Date Re: Notice of Trustee's Motion to Compel Turnover and Certificate of Service filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 58 Motion to Compel).
60
08/22/2014
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 59 Notice of Bar Date)
61
08/22/2014
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Directing Turnover of Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 58 Motion to Compel).
62
08/25/2014
ORDER Granting Motion to Compel (Related Doc # 58) signed on 8/25/2014.
63
08/27/2014
Certificate of Mailing filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 62 Order on Motion to Compel)
64
11/25/2014
Trustee Objection to Claim 4 filed by DAVID 1 BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL Objections/Responses due by 12/12/2014.(BIRDSELL, DAVID 1)
65
01/26/2015
Trustee Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Tax Refunds filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
66
01/26/2015
Notice of Bar Date Re: Notice of Trustee's Motion to Compel Turnover and Certificate of Service filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 65 Motion to Compel).
67
02/20/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 66 Notice of Bar Date)
68
02/20/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Directing Turnover of Property filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 65 Motion to Compel).
69
02/20/2015
ORDER Granting Motion to Compel (Related Doc # 65) signed on 2/20/2015.
70
02/23/2015
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 69 Order on Motion to Compel)
71
02/23/2015
Certificate of Mailing filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 69 Order on Motion to Compel)
72
02/23/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 70 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
73
02/23/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 70 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
74
03/03/2015
Application for Writ of Garnishment for Earnings of Judgment Debtor filed by ALLISON M. LAURITSON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
75
03/05/2015
Writ Issued via mail (related document(s) 74 Application for Writ)
76
04/22/2015
Second Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee and Final Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs for ADAM 1 NACH, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 3/13/2014 to 4/21/2015, Fees:$4,484.00, Expenses: $89.82. filed by ADAM 1 NACH.
1
Exhibit A-Billing Statement-Hibbs2
1 Attachment
77
04/22/2015
Notice of Bar Date of Second and Final Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 76 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
78
04/22/2015
Certificate of Mailing Notice of Second and Final Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 77 Notice of Bar Date)
79
05/19/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 76 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
80
05/19/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Second Application and Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 76 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
81
05/19/2015
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (related document(s) 76 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee)
82
05/19/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Second Application and Authorizing Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 76 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee).
83
05/20/2015
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee (Related Doc # 76) for ADAM 1 NACH, Fees Awarded: $4484.00, Expenses Awarded: $89.82 signed on 5/20/2015.
84
07/08/2015
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order on Trustee's Objection to Claim #4 filed by DAVID 1 BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 64 Trustee Objection to Claim).(BIRDSELL, DAVID 1)
85
07/08/2015
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 4 signed on 7/8/2015 (related document(s) 64 Trustee Objection to Claim).
86
03/03/2016
Trustee Application for Compensation for DAVID A. BIRDSELL, Trustee Chapter 7, Period: to, Fees:$3,350.85, Expenses: $207.96. filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL
1
Trustee's Form I & II).(BIRDSELL, DAVID 1
1 Attachment
87
04/05/2016
Trustee Motion for Status Hearing and Notice of Hearing U.S. Trustee's Motion for Status Hearing filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Status Hearing set for 5/9/2016 at 10:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, AZ
88
04/08/2016
Certificate of Service - United States Trustee's Request for Status Hearing and Notice filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE (related document(s) 87 Trustee Motion for Status Hearing and Notice of Hearing).
89
05/05/2016
Motion to Vacate NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 9, 2016 filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE (related document(s) 87 Trustee Motion for Status Hearing and Notice of Hearing).
90
05/06/2016
Certificate of Service of Notice of Stipulation and Request for Order Continuing Hearing Scheduled for May 9, 2016 filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE (related document(s) 89 Motion to Vacate).
91
05/09/2016
Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/09/2016 Subject: TRUSTEE MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING AND U.S. TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR STATUS HEARING FILED BY LARRY L. WATSON OF OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE. (vCal Hearing ID (1334404)). (related document(s) 87)
92
02/20/2017
Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
93
02/20/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds to the USBC filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 92 Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).
94
02/21/2017
Objection Debtors' Objection to Trustee's Application for Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds to the Bankruptcy Court filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs (related document(s) 92 Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).
95
02/21/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of Penny L. Hibbs, Samuel J Hibbs (related document(s) 94 Objection).
96
01/25/2018
Amended Trustee Application for Compensation for DAVID A. BIRDSELL, Trustee Chapter 7, Period: to, Fees:$3,169.50, Expenses: $219.15. filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 86 Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee Application for Compensation)
1
Trustee's Form I & II).(BIRDSELL, DAVID 1
1 Attachment
97
02/16/2018
Trustee Chapter 7 Final Report and Account. (Dickman, Lori Ann)
98
02/16/2018
Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation. (Dickman, Lori Ann)
99
02/16/2018
The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Application for Compensation and Application(s) for Compensation of Professionals. Filed by the U.S Trustee's Office. (Dickman, Lori Ann)
100
02/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 98 Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch))
101
03/28/2018
Trustee Report of No Objection TO TRUSTEE'S NOTICE OF FINAL REPORT filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 98 Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch)).
102
03/28/2018
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order TO PAY ADMINISTRATIVE FEES AND EXPENSES filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 96 Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee Application for Compensation).
103
03/28/2018
ORDER Granting Trustee Application for Compensation (Related Doc # 96) for DAVID A. BIRDSELL, Fees Awarded: $3169.50, Expenses Awarded: $219.15 signed on 3/28/2018.
104
08/13/2018
Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL.
105
08/13/2018
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order TO PAY UNCLAIMED FUNDS TO USBC filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL (related document(s) 104 Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).
08/14/2018
Receipt for Unclaimed Funds - $9.67 from DAVID BIRDSELL. Receipt Number 20102565. (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
08/15/2018
ORDER to Pay Unclaimed Funds to Court signed on 8/15/2018 (related document(s) 104 Trustee Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court).
107
09/14/2018
Trustee's Report of Final Account and Distribution Report and Application to be Discharged. (Dickman, Lori Ann)
09/14/2018
UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report and Applic of Trustee to be Discharged (batch) (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
09/14/2018
The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed by the U.S Trustee's Office. (Dickman, Lori Ann)
109
09/17/2018
The estate having been fully administered, further administration of the reopened case having been completed, or the case reopened for the filing of further proceedings which either have been filed and no further court action is required or were not filed within 90 days of the reopening; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of their trust. Jurisdiction is retained over any pending adversary(s). Chief Judge Daniel P. Collins
09/17/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.