Sandra Kay Taha
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2011-bk-00750 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
134
06/19/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
135
06/21/2018
Generic Motion / Application
136
06/21/2018
Memorandum in Support
137
06/21/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
138
06/21/2018
Certificate of Service
139
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
07/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
07/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
141
07/20/2018
Generic Motion
142
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
143
10/16/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
144
10/17/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
145
02/06/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
146
02/06/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
147
02/06/2019
Certificate of Service
148
02/06/2019
Employ (CM41)
149
02/08/2019
Employ
02/27/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.