Sandra ann Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04515 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/20/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Sandra Ann Smith
2
10/20/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
3
10/20/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith
5
10/20/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
6
10/20/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
7
10/20/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
8
10/21/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
9
10/21/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/23/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Sandra Ann Smith Case Number 13-04324, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/27/2013, Standard Discharge on 02/07/2014.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/23/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/29/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/21/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/27/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/18/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/29/2018.
11
10/23/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith).
12
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
13
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
14
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
15
10/26/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
16
11/30/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 9/29/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
12/05/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
18
12/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/21/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
12/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/09/2017.
20
12/20/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay regarding a 2017 Toyota Corolla, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP
12/20/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04515-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21531300. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 20) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/20/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay regarding a 2017 Toyota Corolla, Fee Amount $181,).
22
12/20/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One NA (RE: related document(s) 20 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
12/21/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/21/2017 (RE: related document(s) 10 Confirmation Hearing), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/1/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
12/21/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2017 11:17:52 AM ]. File Size [ 546 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:31 ]. (RE: Doc #17; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
26
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
27
12/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/23/2017.
28
12/26/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.).
29
12/26/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2, Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period for 3 Years Form 122C-1. Disposable Income Is Determined Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
30
01/02/2018
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay by Consent (Related Doc # 20) Signed on 1/2/2018.
31
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
32
01/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
01/19/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 149.74 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/19/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04515-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (149.74) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21623679. Fee Amount 149.74 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/01/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/1/2018 11:46:48 AM ]. File Size [ 494 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:22 ]. (RE: Doc #17; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
34
02/02/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/2/2018 (RE: related document(s) 10Confirmation Hearing, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/8/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
35
02/04/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Capital One Auto in the amount of $20,658.59 Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.
36
02/04/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith (RE: related document(s) 28 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith.).).
37
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
38
02/05/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 35 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith). Hearing scheduled 3/22/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
02/07/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 149.74 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04515-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (149.74) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21695054. Fee Amount 149.74 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
02/07/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 149.74 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04515-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (149.74) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21695054. Fee Amount 149.74 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
03/07/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
03/13/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 10.52 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04515-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (10.52) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21831025. Fee Amount 10.52 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/13/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
03/13/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 10.52 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04515-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (10.52) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21831025. Fee Amount 10.52 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
03/16/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 3/16/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn, Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27), Motion to Assume or Reject Contract/Leases (CM06), Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), 36 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Sandra Ann Smith).
43
03/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/18/2018.
44
03/23/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 1 Signed on 3/23/2018 (RE: related document(s) 35 Debtor's Objection to Claim #1 of Capital One Auto Sustained and thebalance of claim number 1 is Disallowed).
45
03/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 44 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 03/25/2018.
46
03/26/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/22/2018 9:55:49 AM ]. File Size [ 174 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:29 ]. (RE: Doc #35; Debtor's Objection to Claim #1 of Capital One Auto in the amount $20,658.59). (adiuser).
47
05/15/2018
Notice of Change of Address Prestige Financial Services.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.