Sanneh et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00232 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
05/30/2018
Notice (Other)
20
06/29/2018
Attorney Fees
21
07/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
24
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
25
08/23/2018
Stipulation
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
28
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
29
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.