Santina M. Gay
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00014 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/19/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Santina m. gay
38
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
39
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
40
06/13/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
41
06/15/2018
Support Documentation
42
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
43
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
44
07/02/2018
Generic Motion
07/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/12/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
01/22/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
47
01/22/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
48
01/22/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
49
02/22/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
50
02/22/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
02/22/2019
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/22/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
52
02/22/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
53
03/29/2019
Proceeding Memo
54
03/29/2019
Claims (SA)
55
03/29/2019
Claims (SA)
03/29/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
57
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.