Schindler et al v. Milliron et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-ap-90001 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/23/2019
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
01/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/24/2019
Summons Issued
3
01/24/2019
Summons Issued
4
02/05/2019
Summons Service Executed
5
02/05/2019
Summons Service Executed
6
02/25/2019
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
7
02/25/2019
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
03/26/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
9
03/28/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
10
03/29/2019
Proceeding Memo
11
04/02/2019
Setting Trial (SA)
04/02/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
04/03/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/04/2019
Proceeding Memo
04/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/18/2019
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.