Schneider v. Baldwin et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00060 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
09/20/2018
Order
6
10/30/2018
Amended Complaint
7
11/15/2018
Order
8
11/21/2018
Response to Order to Show Cause
9
11/29/2018
Order
11/29/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/12/2018
Amended Complaint
11
12/18/2018
Order
12
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
13
04/09/2019
Order
14
05/08/2019
Notice of Change of Address
15
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)
16
05/08/2019
Amended Complaint

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.