Schnider et al v. Providence Health & Services
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00038 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
161
06/14/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
162
08/31/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
165
12/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
12/24/2018
In Limine
168
01/03/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
169
01/07/2019
Notice (Other)
170
01/07/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
171
01/07/2019
Witness List
172
01/08/2019
Transcript
173
01/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
174
01/09/2019
Notice (Other)
175
01/09/2019
Exhibit List
176
01/10/2019
Order on Motion in Limine
177
01/15/2019
Dismiss
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.