Scott Abbott Walker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00007 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
05/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
06/07/2018
Objection to Homestead Exemption (CM46-COAwith)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/11/2018
Certificate of No Objection
72
07/11/2018
Certificate of Service
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.