Scott Alexander Markle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00098 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
06/19/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.