Scott Alexander Markle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00174 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
06/05/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
06/05/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/06/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
8
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
06/25/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
13
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
07/10/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
15
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.