Scott Earl Campbell and Jessica Ann Campbell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00072 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
26
06/07/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/14/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
07/03/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
07/05/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.