Scott Randall Laney, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00160 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
05/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/25/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
doc
05/25/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
doc
05/25/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
doc
05/25/2018
Schedules A-J
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
doc
05/25/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
doc
05/25/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
doc
05/25/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
05/25/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/29/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
05/29/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
doc
05/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
05/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
19
06/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
06/20/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
21
06/20/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
22
06/20/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
06/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
06/20/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
24
06/27/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
06/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/02/2018
Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)
07/03/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/03/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
07/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.