Sea Marita Corporation
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00395 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
49
06/08/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
50
06/08/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
51
09/01/2018
Pay
52
09/01/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
53
09/24/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
54
09/24/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
09/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
09/25/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
56
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
57
10/09/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
58
10/09/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
59
10/11/2018
Joinder
60
10/18/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
61
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
62
10/23/2018
Hearing
63
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
64
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
65
11/20/2018
Pay
11/20/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
12/06/2018
Generic Motion / Application
67
12/06/2018
Certificate of Service
68
12/07/2018
Generic Motion
12/07/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.