Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. v. Alarm Protection Technology, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cv-00102 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
809
07/30/2018
USCA Order
810
10/11/2018
USCA Mandate
811
10/17/2018
Disbursement of Funds
812
10/30/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
813
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
814
11/13/2018
USCA Order
815
11/26/2018
Release of Funds

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.