Sedrick Demon Woods and Erika Shanae Madison
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01803 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 245 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/26/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Sedrick Demon Woods, Erika Shanae Madison
2
04/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.
3
04/26/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/05/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018.
5
04/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.
6
04/26/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.
04/26/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01803-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22006610. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/26/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.
8
04/27/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
04/27/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
04/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 3 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/28/2018.
11
04/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/29/2018.
12
04/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods, Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison). Notice Date 04/29/2018.
13
05/16/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Republic Finance, LLC.
14
05/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/30/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
15
06/04/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
16
06/04/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
06/04/2018
Application to Employ Bradford W. Botes as Special Counsel Filed by Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods
18
06/04/2018
Application to Employ David J. Philipps as Special Counsel Filed by Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods
19
06/04/2018
Application to Employ Mary Philipps as Special Counsel Filed by Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods
20
06/05/2018
Notice and Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 17) Signed on 6/5/2018.
21
06/05/2018
Notice and Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 18) Signed on 6/5/2018.
22
06/05/2018
Notice and Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 19) Signed on 6/5/2018.
06/06/2018
Corrective Entry - regenerated to serve all creditors (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Application to Employ, 21 Order on Application to Employ, 22 Order on Application to Employ). (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/06/2018.
24
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/07/2018.
25
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/07/2018.
26
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/07/2018.
27
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/08/2018.
28
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/08/2018.
29
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/08/2018.
30
07/09/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 28 of Lvnv Funding in the amount of $7206.27 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
31
07/09/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 30 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 8/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
32
07/09/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 30 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
07/09/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.).
34
07/09/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Unifund in the amount of $2,342.65 Filed by Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison, Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods.
35
07/10/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 34 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Sedrick Demon Woods, Joint Debtor Erika Shanae Madison). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
36
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/11/2018.
37
07/12/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/12/2018 (RE: related document(s) 3 Confirmation hearing, 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/12/2018.
39
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/14/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.