Seed to Scale Academy LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00046 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/14/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)
2
02/14/2019
Declaration
3
02/14/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
4
02/14/2019
Entry of Appearance
02/14/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/20/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
02/20/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice)
7
02/20/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
8
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
03/13/2019
Entry of Appearance
03/13/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
03/14/2019
Vacating Order (SA)
13
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
15
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
03/25/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
03/25/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/25/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
18
03/25/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
19
03/26/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
03/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/26/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
03/27/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/27/2019
Notice of Deficiency In Filing Requirements
22
03/27/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
23
03/27/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
03/28/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/28/2019
Notice of Non-Appointment of Creditors Committee
03/28/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/29/2019
Employ (CM41)
26
03/29/2019
Declaration
27
03/29/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
04/01/2019
Generic Motion / Application
29
04/01/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
04/02/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
04/03/2019
Employ (CM41)
31
04/05/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
04/09/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/15/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
33
04/15/2019
Affidavit
04/17/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/17/2019
Hearing
35
04/18/2019
Generic Motion / Application
36
04/18/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
37
04/23/2019
Proceeding Memo
38
04/24/2019
Employ
39
04/24/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
40
04/24/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
41
04/26/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
04/26/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.